blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2680334

EP2680334 - Piezo drive with piezo oscillator with a pivoting bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.01.2015  [2015/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Geosystems AG
Heinrich-Wild-Strasse
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Mueller, Josef
Unterdorfstrasse 3
9413 Oberegg / CH
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Harmann, Bernd-Günther
Kaminski Harmann
Patentanwälte AG
Landstrasse 124
9490 Vaduz / LI
[2014/01]
Application number, filing date12174155.728.06.2012
[2014/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2680334
Date:01.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2012
ClassificationIPC:H01L41/053, H02N2/00, H02N2/10
[2014/01]
CPC:
H02N2/103 (EP); H02N2/0055 (EP); G01C15/002 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Piezo-Antrieb mit drehgelenkgelagertem Piezooszillator[2014/01]
English:Piezo drive with piezo oscillator with a pivoting bearing[2014/01]
French:Commande piezo-électrique avec oscillateur piezo-électrique à articulation rotative[2014/01]
Examination procedure02.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/03]
26.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS61168025  (HITACHI LTD);
 [XY]JP2003339176  (SEIKO INSTR INC);
 [XY]EP1372256  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]);
 [XYI]US2004090146  (MIYAZAWA OSAMU [JP]);
 [XY]US2005082950  (ZAKOJI MAKOTO [JP]);
 [YD]EP1619468  (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH])
by applicantEP1267425
 EP1619468
 EP2200101
 EP2237338
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.