EP2540913 - Protective wall comprising individual protective wall elements for securing traffic routes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luther, Horst Sponheimerweg 5 55765 Birkenfeld / DE | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 12174323.1 | 29.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | DE201120104387U | 01.07.2011 Original published format: DE 202011104387 U | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2540913 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2540913 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2540913 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/08 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
E01F15/083 (EP);
E01F15/085 (EP);
E01F15/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2013/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schutzwand aus einzelnen Schutzwandelementen zur Sicherung von Verkehrswegen | [2013/01] | English: | Protective wall comprising individual protective wall elements for securing traffic routes | [2013/01] | French: | Paroi de protection à partir d'éléments de paroi de protection individuels afin de sécuriser les voies de circulation | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2012 | AL | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | RS | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | GB | 29.06.2016 | IE | 29.06.2016 | LU | 29.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | DK | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | DK | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 30.09.2015 | |
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 30.09.2015 | |
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102007023788 (SPIG SCHUTZPLANKEN PROD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,11 * the whole document * [Y] 5-10,12,13,15; | [XDY]EP1927699 (AVS MELLINGEN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0021] - [0025]; figures 1-4,8 * [Y] 5-10,13,15; | [X]DE202010001863U (NISSEN ADOLF ELEKTROBAU [DE]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0013] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]FR2714406 (SABLA SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, lines 26-30 * * page 4, line 8 - page 8, line 16 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 8,12; | [A]DE102007048304 (HEINTZMANN SICHERHEITSSYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0311015 | US2010290832 | WO2007036239 | by applicant | DE9106411U | US2005201828 | DE1784011 | WO9312300 | DE1908636U | DE2640910 | DE3012681 | EP1927699 |