EP2541396 - Multiple deployment of applications with multiple configurations in an industrial automation environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bliss, Ronald Eric 2972 Zenas Court Twinsburg OH 44087 / US | 02 /
Sauvain, Terrie E. 8473 Acadia Drive Sagamore Hills OH 44067 / US | 03 /
Plache, Kenneth Scott 7457 East Whistling Wind Way Scottsdale AZ 85255 / US | 04 /
Stanek, Christopher E. 2600 Ash Road Willoughby OH 44094 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12174536.8 | 02.07.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | US201113174528 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US201113174528 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2541396 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2541396 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F9/445 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
G06F8/64 (EP,US);
G05B19/41835 (US);
G05B19/04 (US);
G06F8/30 (US);
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
G06F8/63 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23438 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2013/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrfacher Einsatz von Anwendungen mit mehreren Konfigurationen in einer industriellen Automationsumgebung | [2013/01] | English: | Multiple deployment of applications with multiple configurations in an industrial automation environment | [2013/01] | French: | Déploiement multiple d'applications avec plusieurs configurations dans un environnement d'automatisation industrielle | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 08.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008017907 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, lines 1-20 ** page 6, lines 15-32 * |