EP2521364 - Recording medium, playback device and recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/47] | Recording medium, playback device, and integrated circuit | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Wataru c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Ogawa, Tomoki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Taiji c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Yahata, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12174659.8 | 15.02.2010 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | JP20090037225 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009037225 | JP20090066885 | 18.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009066885 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521364 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521364 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/85, H04N7/24, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, H04N21/2365, H04N9/804, H04N9/82, H04N13/00, H04N13/04, H04N21/2343, H04N21/426, H04N21/45, H04N21/488, H04N21/432, H04N21/434 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H04N9/8233 (EP,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,KR,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/25] | H04N5/85, H04N7/32, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, H04N21/2365, H04N9/804, H04N9/82, H04N13/00, H04N13/04, H04N21/2343, H04N21/426, H04N21/45, H04N21/488, H04N21/432, H04N21/434 | ||
Former IPC [2012/45] | H04N13/00, H04N13/04, H04N5/92, H04N9/804, H04N9/82, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, H04N21/2365, H04N21/2343, H04N21/434, H04N21/426, H04N21/488, H04N21/45, H04N21/432 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium, Wiedergabevorrichtung und Aufzeichnungsverfahren | [2013/25] | English: | Recording medium, playback device and recording method | [2013/25] | French: | Support d'enregistrement, dispositif de reproduction et procédé d'enregistrement | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/45] | Aufzeichnungsmedium, Wiedergabevorrichtung, integrierte Schaltung | ||
Former [2012/47] | Recording medium, playback device, and integrated circuit | ||
Former [2012/45] | Support d'enregistrement, dispositif de reproduction, circuit intégré | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 25.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10743541.4 / EP2400773 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100743541) is 25.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | IE | 15.02.2015 | LU | 15.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2015 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2015 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2015 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2015 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | LT | 23.07.2014 | |
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1501316 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0004] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0089] - [0091] * * paragraphs [0123] - [0126] * * paragraphs [0141] - [0145] * * paragraphs [0150] - [0152] * * paragraphs [0171] - [0179] * * figures 1-4, 27,38-42 *; | [Y]EP1863032 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0067] * * figures 12-14 *; | [Y]US2008018731 (ERA KAZUNARI [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5,7,10 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0087] ** figures 1-2,5-6 * | by applicant | JP3935507B |