EP2533560 - METHOD OF FREQUENCY CHANNEL ASSIGNMENT USING EFFECTIVE SPECTRUM SENSING IN MULTIPLE FA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Bub-Joo 103-1001 Hanmaroo Apt. Doonsan-dong, Seo-gu 302-120 Daejeon-city / KR | 02 /
Song, Myung-Sun 102-1402 Hanbit Apt. Eoeun-dong, Yusong-gu 305-755 Daejeon-city / KR | 03 /
Kim, Chang-Joo 105-1502 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong, Yusong-gu 305-761 Daejeon-city / KR | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12175502.9 | 13.10.2006 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | KR20050097113 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050097113 | KR20060098640 | 10.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060098640 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2533560 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2533560 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/715 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/563 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FREQUENZKANALZUWEISUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EFFEKTIVER SPEKTRUM-MESSUNG IN EINEM MEHRFACH-FA-SYSTEM | [2012/50] | English: | METHOD OF FREQUENCY CHANNEL ASSIGNMENT USING EFFECTIVE SPECTRUM SENSING IN MULTIPLE FA SYSTEM | [2012/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE VOIES DE FRÉQUENCES PAR DÉTECTION DE SPECTRE EFFICACE DANS UN SYSTÈME À MULTIPLES FA | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 20.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06799201.6 / EP1935126 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060799201) is 04.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0074415 (ERICSSON INC [US]); | [A]EP1248477 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]WO2004070988 (ATHEROS COMM INC [US], et al) |