12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
20.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
13.02.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
16.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
07.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
25.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
26.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |