EP2546936 - Visual indicator device and heat sink for input/output connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Nederland B.V. Rietveldenweg 32 5222 AR's-Hertogenbosch / NL | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Nederland B.V. Rietveldenweg 32 5222 AR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Laarhoven, Antonius Petrus Westenburgerweg 238 5213 SR Hertogenbosch / NL | 02 /
Walmsley, Michael John 40 Blue Jay Circle Elizabethtown, PA Pennsylvania 17022 / US | 03 /
Hooft, Theo Dr. Hoekstraat 7 5268 Helvoirt / NL | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12175631.6 | 10.07.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | US201113180165 | 11.07.2011 Original published format: US201113180165 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546936 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546936 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/717, // H01R12/79, H01R13/74, H04Q1/02 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H01R13/717 (EP,US);
H04Q1/035 (EP,US);
H04Q1/136 (EP,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,US);
H01R13/7175 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | H01R13/717 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sichtanzeigevorrichtung und Wärmesenke für Eingabe-/Ausgabesteckverbinder | [2013/03] | English: | Visual indicator device and heat sink for input/output connectors | [2013/03] | French: | Dispositif indicateur visuel et dissipateur thermique pour connecteurs d'entrée/sortie | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002019154 (NA SANG JU [KR]) [X] 1,3-8 * figures 5,9 * [Y] 2; | [X]EP0817323 (BERG ELECTRONICS MFG [NL]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0977323 (FCI S HERTOGENBOSCH BV [NL]) [Y] 2 * figure 8 *; | [AD]US5924890 (MORIN SCOTT F [US], et al) [AD] 1-8 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US5924890 |