EP2551542 - Wheel-hub bearing/constant-velocity joint unit provided with a protective screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/05] | Protective screen for constant-velocity joints and wheel-hub bearing/constant-velocity joint unit provided with said protective screen | ||
[2018/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2019/20] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finetti, William Via Puccini, 39/4 10040 La Loggia (TO) / IT | 02 /
Fischer, Dominik Am Feldweinberg 1 97535 Wasserlosen / DE | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Tedeschini, Luca SKF Industrie S.p.A. Via Pinerolo, 44 10060 Airasca (TO) / IT | [2013/05] | Application number, filing date | 12175802.3 | 10.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00697 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110697 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2551542 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2551542 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/84, B60B27/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
B60B27/0036 (EP,US);
F16D3/843 (US);
B60B27/0073 (EP,US);
F16C33/805 (EP,US);
F16D3/223 (EP);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2013/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Radnabenlager-/Gleichlaufgelenkeinheit mit Schutzblende | [2018/48] | English: | Wheel-hub bearing/constant-velocity joint unit provided with a protective screen | [2018/48] | French: | Unité de palier de moyeu de roue/joint à vitesse constante dotée d' un écran protecteur | [2018/48] |
Former [2013/05] | Schutzblende für Gleichlaufgelenke und Radnabenlager-/Gleichlaufgelenkeinheit mit besagter Schutzblende | ||
Former [2013/05] | Protective screen for constant-velocity joints and wheel-hub bearing/constant-velocity joint unit provided with said protective screen | ||
Former [2013/05] | Écran protecteur pour joints à vitesse constante et unité de palier de moyeu de roue/joint à vitesse constante dotée dudit écran protecteur | Examination procedure | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 11.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2012 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | IE | 10.07.2019 | LU | 10.07.2019 | FR | 15.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | GB | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.07.2012 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GB | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.07.2012 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GB | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GB | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GB | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GB | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
FR | 15.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 10.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0619438 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]JP2003049852 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1,9* figure 1 *; | [A]US2008285902 (NAGAYAMA YASUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure 13 * |