EP2546474 - Assembly for aligning an inner shell of a turbine casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASAVANT, Matthew Stephen 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12175805.6 | 10.07.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | US201113181812 | 13.07.2011 Original published format: US201113181812 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546474 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/28 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
F01D25/285 (EP,US);
F01D11/22 (US);
F01D25/28 (US);
F04D29/644 (US);
Y10T29/53978 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Ausrichtung einer Innenschale eines Turbinengehäuses | [2013/03] | English: | Assembly for aligning an inner shell of a turbine casing | [2013/03] | French: | Ensemble permettant d'aligner une coque interne d'un carter de turbine | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |