EP2512060 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CLOCK TRANSMISSION BETWEEN NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/42] | Method and apparatus of clock transmission between networks | ||
[2016/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/23] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheng, Yong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Bao, Xiaodong Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Zhang, Zhan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 04 /
He, Yinghai Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 05 /
Wu, Ning Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/42] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176086.2 | 21.04.2008 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | CN200710102025 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: CN200710102025 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2512060 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2512060 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512060 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, // H04L12/46 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
H04J3/0641 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0089 (EP,US);
H04J3/0647 (EP,US);
H04J3/0667 (EP,US);
H04J3/0673 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | H04L7/00, // H04J3/06, H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TAKTTRANSFER ZWISCHEN NETZWERKEN | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CLOCK TRANSMISSION BETWEEN NETWORKS | [2016/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT D'HORLOGE ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT D'HORLOGE ENTRE DES RÉSEAUX | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/42] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Takttransfer zwischen Netzwerken | ||
Former [2012/42] | Method and apparatus of clock transmission between networks | ||
Former [2012/42] | Procédé de transfert d'horloge et appareil de transfert d'horloge entre des réseaux | Examination procedure | 12.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08734011.3 / EP2071760 | Divisional application(s) | EP16173244.1 / EP3096474 | EP19192011.5 / EP3599729 | EP20206843.3 / EP3849111 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080734011) is 17.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2008 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | IT | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
IT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6173023 (TANONAKA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6,7,9-11 * column 10, line 20 - line 26 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, line 38 - line 51 * * column 2, line 17 - line 41 * * figures 2A,2B,3,4,8-10 *; | [I] - Michael Mayer, "Functional Modeling of Synchronization Networks", Prague, (20061127), pages 1 - 21, International Telecom Sync Forum, URL: www.telecom-sync.com/pdf/2006/12_Michael_Mayer.pdf, (20110204), XP002620586 [I] 1-13 * pages 9,12 * * pages 13,17 * | [I] - ANONYMOUS, "Timing and synchronization aspects of packet networks; G.8261/Y.1361 (05/06)", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20060522), no. G.8261/Y.1361 (05/06, pages 1 - 64, XP017404650 [I] 1-13 * page 30 - page 31; figure 15 * * page 62, paragraph VIII.2 * | [I] - JUERGEN RAHN, "Issues with use of Slow protocol OAM PDUs for SSM in Ethernet networks; D 631", ITU-T DRAFT STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA, CH, (20060206), vol. STUDY GROUP 15, pages 1 - 2, XP017407747 [I] 4,5,12,13 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0013354 | - IEC 61588, "IEEE 1588: precision clock synchronization protocol for networked measurement and control systems", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD - IECNORME INTERNATIONALE - CEI, X, XX, (20040901), no. 61588, page complete, XP002367391 | - KLETT TH, "NETWORK SYNCHRONIZATION ASPECTS", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION, ALCATEL. BRUSSELS, BE, (19970101), ISSN 0013-4252, pages 31 - 37, XP000685831 |