EP2511329 - Method for making foams using blowing agents comprising unsaturated fluorocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19801 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 N. Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Creazzo, Joseph Anthony 5 Quail Court Wilmington, DE Delaware 19810 / US | 02 /
Nappa, Mario Joseph 3 Oakridge Court Newark, DE Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
Sievert, Allen Capron 215 Rhett Lane Elkton, MD Maryland 21921 / US | 04 /
Swearingen, Ekaterina N. 1302 North Rodney Street Wilmington, DE Delaware 19806 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12176140.7 | 01.11.2006 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | US20050732090P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732090 P | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2511329 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2511329 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
C08J9/144 (EP);
C08J9/14 (KR);
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08J9/22 (KR);
C08G2101/00 (KR);
C08J2375/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schaumstoffen unter Verwendung von Treibmitteln, umfassend ungesättigte Fluorkohlenstoffe | [2012/42] | English: | Method for making foams using blowing agents comprising unsaturated fluorocarbons | [2012/42] | French: | Procédés pour produire des mousses en utilisant des agents gonflants qui comprennent des fluorocarbures insaturés | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06827268.1 / EP1943299 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060827268) is 06.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05179043 ; | [X]US2004256594 (SINGH RAJIV R [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * examples 4,5 * * claims 16-26 *; | [X]US5037572 (MERCHANT ABID N [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, lines 15-36 * * column 3, lines 37-56 * * claims 1,13 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 33, Database accession no. 1993-261758, XP002467615 & JPH05179043 A 19930720 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US6703431 | US6071580 | US5977271 | US6787580 | US5332761 | US6590005 | US4704410 | US4704411 | US5204169 | - JEANNEAUX ET AL., JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 4, pages 261 - 270 | - SAUNDERS; FRISCH, Polyurethanes Chemistry and Technology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1962), vol. I, II | - STOCKDOPOLE; WELSH, Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), vol. 16, pages 193 - 205 | US20050732791 | US20050732581 |