EP2575172 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2015/45] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Hiroyuki c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Yukihiro c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 03 /
Fujiki, Atsushi c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 04 /
Seki, Tatsuhiro c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Addiss, John William, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12176514.3 | 16.07.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | JP20110214474 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011214474 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575172 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575172 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/088, H01L23/495 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/088 (EP,US);
H01L23/49524 (EP,US);
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L23/49575 (EP,US);
H01L24/37 (EP,US);
H01L24/40 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L29/7815 (EP);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/37011 (EP,US);
H01L2224/371 (EP,US);
H01L2224/37124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/37147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/37599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40095 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73221 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73263 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8485 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12036 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/37599, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48137, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73221, H01L2224/40245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/83801, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8385, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84801, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/8485, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12036, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement | [2013/14] | English: | Semiconductor device | [2013/14] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007228534 (UNO TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0149] , [0155] , [0179] , [0397] , [0418] *; | [Y]US2008054422 (KOIKE NOBUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] , [0206] *; | [Y]US2009189219 (SHINBORI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US2010187640 (MIYATA TAKUJI [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2010238993 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010320461 (SU YI [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * |