EP2549267 - Sample container for calorimetric measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISSI Process Safety GmbH Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stocks, Volker Waldeckstrasse 55/2 79400 Kandern / DE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12176551.5 | 16.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | CH20110001229 | 21.07.2011 Original published format: CH 12292011 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549267 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549267 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/20, B01L3/04, B65D43/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
B01L3/04 (EP);
G01N25/20 (EP);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2300/042 (EP);
B01L2300/1805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | Probengefäss für kalorimetrische Messungen | [2013/04] | English: | Sample container for calorimetric measurements | [2013/04] | French: | Récipient d'échantillon pour mesures calorimétriques | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2012 | AL | 29.01.2014 | BG | 29.01.2014 | CY | 29.01.2014 | CZ | 29.01.2014 | DK | 29.01.2014 | EE | 29.01.2014 | ES | 29.01.2014 | FI | 29.01.2014 | HR | 29.01.2014 | IT | 29.01.2014 | LT | 29.01.2014 | LV | 29.01.2014 | MC | 29.01.2014 | MK | 29.01.2014 | MT | 29.01.2014 | NL | 29.01.2014 | PL | 29.01.2014 | RO | 29.01.2014 | RS | 29.01.2014 | SE | 29.01.2014 | SI | 29.01.2014 | SK | 29.01.2014 | SM | 29.01.2014 | TR | 29.01.2014 | NO | 29.04.2014 | GR | 30.04.2014 | IS | 29.05.2014 | PT | 29.05.2014 | IE | 16.07.2014 | LU | 16.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.07.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MK | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 16.07.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.07.2012 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 16.07.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 29.01.2014 | |
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 29.01.2014 | |
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1086957 (SANKO CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 3,4 * [I] 9,10; | [XY]GB191017555 (WALLER WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 11-14 * figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 15; | [YD]JP2001004571 (RICOH KK) [YD] 15 * abstract *; | [XI]EP0672590 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 2,4,5 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]EP0226906 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 1 * [I] 9,10 | by applicant | CH695709 | CH696370 | JP2003028820 | JPH0469561 | JPH09178683 | JPH0933463 | US4303615 | JP2001004571 |