EP2514640 - Method and apparatus for estimation of road condition and tire running state, ABS and car control making use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/43] | Method and apparatus for estimation of road condition and tire running state, and abs and car control making use thereof | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Bridgestone 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokota, Hidetoshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Bridgestone Technical Center 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | 02 /
Morinaga, Hiroshi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Bridgestone Technical Center 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/46] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12176597.8 | 20.12.2002 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010390560 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001390560 | JP20010390583 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001390583 | JP20010390605 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001390605 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514640 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2514640 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, B60T8/58, G01N19/02, B60C23/00, B60T8/172, B60T8/173, B60C23/04 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
B60T8/173 (EP,US);
B60C23/0477 (EP,US);
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/1725 (EP,US);
B60T2210/12 (EP,US);
B60T2210/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2012/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Schätzung der Straßenbedingungen und des Reifenlaufzustands sowie ABS und Fahrzeugsteuerung damit | [2012/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for estimation of road condition and tire running state, ABS and car control making use thereof | [2015/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'estimation de l'état de la route et de l'état de fonctionnement de pneumatiques et de l'ABS et de commande de voiture faisant usage de celui-ci | [2015/10] |
Former [2012/43] | Method and apparatus for estimation of road condition and tire running state, and abs and car control making use thereof | ||
Former [2012/43] | Procédé et appareil pour l'estimation de l'état de la route et de l'état de fonctionnement de pneumatiques et de l'abs et de commande de voiture faisant usage de celui-ci | Examination procedure | 08.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02805488.0 / EP1457388 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020805488) is 06.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0392686 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * figure 4b * [A] 3,6-9; | [YA]EP0748730 (JAPAN ELECTRONICS IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0025] * * figure 2 * [A] 3,6-9; | [YA]EP0645288 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 13; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,5-9; | [Y]EP0968892 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO0187647 (NIRA AUTOMOTIVE AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 5; figures 1,2,6,8,33 * | by applicant | JP2000055790 | JPH06258196 | JPH1194661 |