08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
07.05.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
29.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
26.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.04.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
29.06.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
25.06.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
17.11.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
17.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
14.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |