Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012101510 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010065043 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009073868 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009073867 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | WO2008US85754 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009072077 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009072076 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A3 | WO2009072076 | 11.06.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009072075 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A9 | WO2009072075 | 05.11.2009 | A3 | WO2009072075 | 11.06.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB55092 | 04.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009007782 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2009 | A4 | WO2009007782 | 19.03.2009 | A3 | WO2009007782 | 15.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008142480 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A4 | WO2008142480 | 23.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008142480 | 27.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008132553 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2010 | A3 | WO2008132553 | 06.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008132551 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008132551 | 06.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008125915 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2009 | A3 | WO2008125915 | 23.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024275285 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US202117344602 | 10.06.2021 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US201715593942 | 12.05.2017 | US201816126306 | 10.09.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201314063222 | 25.10.2013 | US202418444954 | 19.02.2024 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024250716 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615369881 | 05.12.2016 | US201213372009 | 13.02.2012 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202318538061 | 13.12.2023 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024213379 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US202418599787 | 08.03.2024 | US202318312755 | 05.05.2023 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201615365084 | 30.11.2016 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US202217944573 | 14.09.2022 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016821493 | 17.03.2020 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024128926 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514954209 | 30.11.2015 | US201916433072 | 06.06.2019 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US202318544649 | 19.12.2023 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201615357442 | 21.11.2016 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024120879 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318536567 | 12.12.2023 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US202117509491 | 25.10.2021 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201916269403 | 06.02.2019 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024069072 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US202117182602 | 23.02.2021 | US201715834929 | 07.12.2017 | US202318504678 | 08.11.2023 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US201414582363 | 24.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024048097 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117398840 | 10.08.2021 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US202318338527 | 21.06.2023 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US201514743018 | 18.06.2015 | US201815949369 | 10.04.2018 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023367354 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US201414183214 | 18.02.2014 | US201715641553 | 05.07.2017 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US202117514139 | 29.10.2021 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201916545361 | 20.08.2019 | US202318301383 | 17.04.2023 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023221145 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US202117228245 | 12.04.2021 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | US202016823406 | 19.03.2020 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715480574 | 06.04.2017 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US201916250200 | 17.01.2019 | US202318150044 | 04.01.2023 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023163689 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715495301 | 24.04.2017 | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US202318158914 | 24.01.2023 | US201916675870 | 06.11.2019 | US201816149679 | 02.10.2018 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US201414324820 | 07.07.2014 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022263461 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US202217686814 | 04.03.2022 | US201815952037 | 12.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201514809511 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019080346 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US201514743018 | 18.06.2015 | US201815949369 | 10.04.2018 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018034269 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715730470 | 11.10.2017 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9979280 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2018 | B2 | US2017141679 | 18.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615184040 | 16.06.2016 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9853490 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2016241079 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US201314078011 | 12.11.2013 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US91115310 | 25.10.2010 | US201615139745 | 27.04.2016 | US25468109 | 24.10.2009 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016164456 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615045740 | 17.02.2016 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411308 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9537445 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2017 | B2 | US2016079916 | 17.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514954209 | 30.11.2015 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9948233 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2015333692 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201514809511 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9966766 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2018 | B2 | US2015303711 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95148507 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9960731 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2015288330 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US201514743018 | 18.06.2015 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9543889 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2015155825 | 04.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9869701 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2018 | B2 | US2015115984 | 30.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US201414582363 | 24.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9644993 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2015100257 | 09.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9960667 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2014321175 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9673711 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | B2 | US2014320101 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US201414324820 | 07.07.2014 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9853538 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2014233286 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201414183214 | 18.02.2014 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9368964 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2016 | B2 | US2014152240 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US201314078011 | 12.11.2013 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US91115310 | 25.10.2010 | US25468109 | 24.10.2009 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9407161 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2014119075 | 01.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | WO2008US85754 | 05.12.2008 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9680304 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | B2 | US2014049115 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201314063222 | 25.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8903681 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2013332093 | 12.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8659188 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2014 | B2 | US2013193945 | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8773092 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2013054041 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9041339 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2015 | B2 | US2013043839 | 21.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US95148507 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8599588 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2013 | B2 | US2012319490 | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | WO2008US85754 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012175963 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9590526 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2017 | B2 | US2012139343 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201213372009 | 13.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9831824 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2012007613 | 12.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113238041 | 21.09.2011 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411408 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8587151 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2011291486 | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8384243 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2013 | B2 | US2011273016 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9130401 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2015 | B2 | US2011273015 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8004117 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2011 | B2 | US2011140536 | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201113034675 | 24.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9112379 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2013207469 | 15.08.2013 | A9 | US2011121652 | 26.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8618692 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2013 | B2 | US2011084553 | 14.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US91115310 | 25.10.2010 | US25468109 | 24.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8947194 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2010301991 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8963369 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2009206666 | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8289742 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B2 | US2009147554 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | WO2008US85754 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8049523 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2011 | B2 | US2009146671 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411408 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8324921 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2012 | B2 | US2009146667 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9291696 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2016 | B2 | US2009145480 | 11.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB55092 | 04.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411308 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8816535 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2014 | B2 | US2009141522 | 04.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US97876407 | 10.10.2007 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8531055 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2009140715 | 04.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8319483 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2009039852 | 12.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7900361 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2011 | B2 | US2008164766 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8013472 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2011 | B2 | US2008150366 | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8473250 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2013 | B2 | US2008147335 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008144294 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95148507 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9088178 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2015 | B2 | US2008143188 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8319471 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2008136367 | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12068599 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2024 | B2 | US2019149037 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201815893006 | 09.02.2018 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201916243612 | 09.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12055647 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2024 | B2 | US2023280434 | 07.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117520982 | 08.11.2021 | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US202318317243 | 15.05.2023 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615184040 | 16.06.2016 | US202016830804 | 26.03.2020 | US201815958129 | 20.04.2018 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12046940 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2024 | B2 | US2023327467 | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US202117325838 | 20.05.2021 | US201815944299 | 03.04.2018 | US201916254014 | 22.01.2019 | US202318313588 | 08.05.2023 | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US202016861893 | 29.04.2020 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12032080 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2012248863 | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201213440378 | 05.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12027970 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2024 | B2 | US2019149036 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615369881 | 05.12.2016 | US201213372009 | 13.02.2012 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201916243817 | 09.01.2019 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12027849 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2024 | B2 | US2017317523 | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US201314078011 | 12.11.2013 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715653049 | 18.07.2017 | US91115310 | 25.10.2010 | US201615139745 | 27.04.2016 | US25468109 | 24.10.2009 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11962243 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B2 | US2021408797 | 30.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US202117344602 | 10.06.2021 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US201715593942 | 12.05.2017 | US201816126306 | 10.09.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201314063222 | 25.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11961922 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B2 | US2023361225 | 09.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US202318312755 | 05.05.2023 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201615365084 | 30.11.2016 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US202217944573 | 14.09.2022 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016821493 | 17.03.2020 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11894806 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2022149783 | 12.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514954209 | 30.11.2015 | US201916433072 | 06.06.2019 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US202217583461 | 25.01.2022 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201615357442 | 21.11.2016 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11888387 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2024 | B2 | US2017222542 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US201615369881 | 05.12.2016 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201213372009 | 13.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11881814 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2024 | B2 | US2022052640 | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258905 | 05.12.2005 | US202117509491 | 25.10.2021 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201916269403 | 06.02.2019 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11867729 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2021285988 | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US202117182602 | 23.02.2021 | US201715834929 | 07.12.2017 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US201414582363 | 24.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11855231 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2023 | B2 | US2023068438 | 02.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US202217944573 | 14.09.2022 | US201615365084 | 30.11.2016 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016821493 | 17.03.2020 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11735910 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2023 | B2 | US2022360075 | 10.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US201314078011 | 12.11.2013 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715653049 | 18.07.2017 | US91115310 | 25.10.2010 | US201615139745 | 27.04.2016 | US25468109 | 24.10.2009 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US202217873438 | 26.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11728768 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2023 | B2 | US2022038050 | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117398840 | 10.08.2021 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US201514743018 | 18.06.2015 | US201815949369 | 10.04.2018 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11693080 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2023 | B2 | US2022149724 | 12.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117520982 | 08.11.2021 | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615184040 | 16.06.2016 | US202016830804 | 26.03.2020 | US201815958129 | 20.04.2018 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11687112 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B2 | US2022052604 | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201414183214 | 18.02.2014 | US201916545361 | 20.08.2019 | US201715641553 | 05.07.2017 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US202117514139 | 29.10.2021 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11682918 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B2 | US2021399562 | 23.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202117325838 | 20.05.2021 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US202016861893 | 29.04.2020 | US201815944299 | 03.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201916254014 | 22.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11671095 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2023 | B2 | US2021336454 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117366038 | 02.07.2021 | US201862634683 | 23.02.2018 | US201916254014 | 22.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11658482 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2020389020 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US202016905291 | 18.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11598652 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2023 | B2 | US2021302482 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715480574 | 06.04.2017 | US202117228245 | 12.04.2021 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US201916250200 | 17.01.2019 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | US202016823406 | 19.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11594968 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020144919 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715495301 | 24.04.2017 | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201916675870 | 06.11.2019 | US201816149679 | 02.10.2018 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US201414324820 | 07.07.2014 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11594882 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020389018 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016905144 | 18.06.2020 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11594881 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020389017 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US202016905068 | 18.06.2020 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11594880 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2020389016 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016905000 | 18.06.2020 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11579235 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2023 | B2 | US2012212066 | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201213430388 | 26.03.2012 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11575261 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2023 | B2 | US2020389021 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016905361 | 18.06.2020 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11575260 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2023 | B2 | US2020321780 | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016905257 | 18.06.2020 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11569660 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | B2 | US2020389022 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US202016905402 | 18.06.2020 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11569659 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | B2 | US2020389019 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US86896207 | 07.12.2007 | US202016905195 | 18.06.2020 | US201113308517 | 30.11.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11476799 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2022 | B2 | US2020220494 | 09.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201615365084 | 30.11.2016 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US202016821493 | 17.03.2020 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11309832 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2022 | B2 | US2018234049 | 16.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113015612 | 28.01.2011 | US201815952037 | 12.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201514809511 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11296650 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2017294780 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US32952508 | 05.12.2008 | US201715627037 | 19.06.2017 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615369881 | 05.12.2016 | US201213372009 | 13.02.2012 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11264947 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2019326854 | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514954209 | 30.11.2015 | US201916433072 | 06.06.2019 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201615357442 | 21.11.2016 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11183969 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B2 | US2019173424 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201916269403 | 06.02.2019 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11183923 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B2 | US2020328673 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615184040 | 16.06.2016 | US202016830804 | 26.03.2020 | US201815958129 | 20.04.2018 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11183922 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B2 | US2019379279 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201414183214 | 18.02.2014 | US201916545361 | 20.08.2019 | US201715641553 | 05.07.2017 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11073543 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | B2 | US2019146016 | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715480574 | 06.04.2017 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US201916250200 | 17.01.2019 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11063440 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2021 | B2 | US2019123564 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US201715593942 | 12.05.2017 | US201816126306 | 10.09.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201314063222 | 25.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11056875 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2021 | B2 | US2019267793 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916245014 | 10.01.2019 | US201862634683 | 23.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11043820 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B2 | US2020328602 | 15.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US202016861893 | 29.04.2020 | US201815944299 | 03.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201916254014 | 22.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11031861 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B2 | US2018166974 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | US201815893006 | 09.02.2018 | US201414323531 | 03.07.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11002774 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2021 | B2 | US2020217877 | 09.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715480574 | 06.04.2017 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US201916250200 | 17.01.2019 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | US202016823406 | 19.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10969412 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B2 | US2018210016 | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US201715834929 | 07.12.2017 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | US201414582363 | 24.12.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10693415 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | B2 | US2020119688 | 16.04.2020 | A9 | US2019013777 | 10.01.2019 | A9 | US2016373006 | 22.12.2016 | A9 | US2011125431 | 26.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10673253 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2020 | B2 | US2019326759 | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US201815944299 | 03.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201916254014 | 22.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10644589 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2020 | B2 | US2019097531 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213596308 | 28.08.2012 | US32952008 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US201615184040 | 16.06.2016 | US201815958129 | 20.04.2018 | US201314071780 | 05.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10637393 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | B2 | US2017179877 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3911308 | 25.03.2008 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US201615365084 | 30.11.2016 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US41129409 | 25.03.2009 | US201414582381 | 24.12.2014 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10516336 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2019036455 | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715495301 | 24.04.2017 | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201816149679 | 02.10.2018 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US201414324820 | 07.07.2014 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10461687 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | B2 | US2017214363 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514954209 | 30.11.2015 | US31411508 | 04.12.2008 | US201615357442 | 21.11.2016 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10447150 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2019 | B2 | US2017373590 | 28.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201414183214 | 18.02.2014 | US201715641553 | 05.07.2017 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201313743581 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10230245 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2018226807 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514693264 | 22.04.2015 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201213661496 | 26.10.2012 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US201815944299 | 03.04.2018 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10184965 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B2 | US2017212158 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US95141907 | 06.12.2007 | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201715480574 | 06.04.2017 | US201313901890 | 24.05.2013 | US95156207 | 06.12.2007 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US201414513877 | 14.10.2014 | US95148507 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10116217 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2017324330 | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715495301 | 24.04.2017 | US95426107 | 06.08.2007 | US18733508 | 06.08.2008 | US201213661503 | 26.10.2012 | US201414324820 | 07.07.2014 | US95435407 | 07.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10097007 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2018 | B2 | US2017250541 | 31.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US201113207321 | 10.08.2011 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US201715593942 | 12.05.2017 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | US201314063222 | 25.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012511299 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011507465 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010521720 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04591 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010512139 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4283853 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A3 | EP4283853 | 29.11.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | EP15183689 | 05.12.2008 | EP08878650 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3736866 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | B1 | EP3736866 | 11.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | EP12176089 | 06.12.2007 | EP18199117 | 06.12.2007 | EP07873361 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3726688 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176618 | 16.07.2012 | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3561881 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB55095 | 04.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | EP08856716 | 04.12.2008 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3553912 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | EP07874022 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04586 | 06.12.2007 | EP12188944 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3496258 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | EP08857835 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3447874 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3447874 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | EP12176089 | 06.12.2007 | EP07873361 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3288165 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2021 | B1 | EP3288165 | 28.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | EP07875148 | 06.12.2007 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007IB04643 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2988386 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2023 | B1 | EP2988386 | 24.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | EP08878650 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2668517 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2023 | B1 | EP2668517 | 04.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB00123 | 27.01.2012 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2557650 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | EP2557650 | 07.08.2013 | A3 | EP2557650 | 13.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | EP07874022 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04586 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2549635 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B1 | EP2549635 | 23.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2533299 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2533299 | 12.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | EP07873361 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2374190 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2023 | B2 | EP2374190 | 14.10.2015 | B1 | EP2374190 | 01.05.2013 | A4 | EP2374190 | 12.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2232690 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B1 | EP2232690 | 08.01.2014 | A4 | EP2232690 | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | WO2008US85754 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2232663 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B2 | EP2232663 | 07.11.2018 | B1 | EP2232663 | 17.06.2015 | A4 | EP2232663 | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2225778 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP2225778 | 08.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB55095 | 04.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | US3905008 | 24.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2135348 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2015 | B1 | EP2135348 | 23.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04591 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2092631 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2092631 | 26.08.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007IB04643 | 06.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2092625 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | B1 | EP2092625 | 26.08.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04586 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2089913 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | B1 | EP2089913 | 19.08.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117978142 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201910128536 | 21.02.2019 | US201862634683 | 23.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110190839B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B | CN110190839 | 30.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862634683 | 23.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106887861B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2021 | B | CN106887861 | 23.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210253614 | 20.07.2012 | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106849872B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2019 | B | CN106849872 | 13.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280006369 | 27.01.2012 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103339521B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | B | CN103339521 | 02.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012IB00123 | 27.01.2012 | US201113015219 | 27.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103001244B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | B | CN103001244 | 27.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113186601 | 20.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101636847B | 04.05.2011 | B | CN101636847 | 27.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04584 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101933209B | 21.10.2015 | B | CN101933209 | 29.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101953060B | 09.09.2015 | B | CN101953060 | 19.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | WO2007IB04591 | 06.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102239618B | 06.05.2015 | B | CN102239618 | 09.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104821709B | 16.02.2018 | B | CN104821709 | 05.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200880132210 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105140952B | 02.11.2018 | B | CN105140952 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US90809507 | 26.03.2007 | US95027107 | 04.12.2007 | US86896206 | 07.12.2006 | US86885106 | 06.12.2006 | US86889306 | 06.12.2006 | US95022407 | 04.12.2007 | US95030707 | 04.12.2007 | CN200780045351 | 06.12.2007 | US91681507 | 09.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105244905B | 21.05.2019 | B | CN105244905 | 13.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200880119506 | 05.12.2008 | WO2008US85755 | 05.12.2008 | US99258907 | 05.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2480717 | 22.01.2014 | B | GB2480717 | 30.11.2011 | A | GB201100463D0 | 23.02.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US18094009 | 26.05.2009 | US78806610 | 26.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2480015 | 28.12.2011 | B | GB2480015 | 02.11.2011 | A | GB201109618D0 | 20.07.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85736 | 05.12.2008 | US32874208 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2546947 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2020 | B1 | EP2546947 | 20.12.2017 | A3 | EP2546947 | 16.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113182758 | 14.07.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP3726688 |