EP2587449 - System and method for processing digital signals of infrared image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou SAT Infrared Technology Co., Ltd. 10 Dongjiang Avenue Guangzhou Economic & Technol. Development District Guangzhou Guangdong 510730 / CN | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jiping Guangzhou SAT Infrared Technology Co. Ltd 10 Dongjiang Ave. GETDD Guangzhou Guangdong 510730 / CN | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Pallini Gervasi, Diego, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Pallini, Diego, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176672.9 | 17.07.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | CN201110340580 | 25.10.2011 Original published format: CN201110340580 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2587449 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/40, H04N5/33 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
H04N23/20 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Digitalsignalen von Infrarotbildern | [2013/18] | English: | System and method for processing digital signals of infrared image | [2013/18] | French: | Système et procédé de traitement de signaux numériques d'image infrarouge | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 20.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 11.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 11.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576003 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]); | [I]WO2008154281 (SENSORS UNLIMITED INC [US], et al); | [A]US2010290702 (YU SHANSHAN [JP], et al) |