EP2568454 - Machine for preparing and dispensing a drink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIELAFF GMBH & CO. KG AUTOMATENBAU Münchenerstrasse 20 91567 Herrieden / DE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utschig, Jürgen Albert-Schweitzer-Str. 18 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176807.1 | 18.07.2012 | [2013/11] | Priority number, date | DE201120105477U | 08.09.2011 Original published format: DE 202011105477 U | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2568454 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2568454 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07F13/00, A47F1/10 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
G07F13/10 (EP);
A47F1/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automat zur Zubereitung und Ausgabe eines Getränks | [2013/11] | English: | Machine for preparing and dispensing a drink | [2013/11] | French: | Automate destiné à la préparation et la sortie d'une boisson | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6102246 (GOULET DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2 * * column 4 - column 6; figures 1-6; claims 1, 13,17a-17b, 22 *; | [I]EP1254621 (JOFEMAR SA [ES]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] *; | [XP]DE202011105477U (SIELAFF GMBH CO AUTOMATEN [DE]) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]US3311260 (WILLIAM KINNEY ALFRED) [I] 1-14 * column 4 - column 9; figures 1,3,11 *; | [I]US6550638 (MOCHIDA YUKIHIDE [JP]) [I] 1-14 * column 4 - column 9; figures 3,4,14b *; | [A]US5172828 (FICKEN LEONARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]KR20020012698 (WONNAM PREC INDUSTRY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US6881380 (MOOTZ FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US6116460 (KIM OH-BOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | DE69208795T |