Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9415887 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2015217884 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015528762 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2878863 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | C | CA2878863 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013292445B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | B2 | AU2013292445 | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015000910 | 08.12.2020 | B1 | BR112015000910 | 27.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX360592 | 09.11.2018 | B | MX2015000692 | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2632288 | 03.10.2017 | C2 | RU2015105429 | 10.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | WO2013EP62379 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014012723 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2687360 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B8 | EP2687360 | 28.02.2018 | B1 | EP2687360 | 22.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2687360T | 16.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2664192T | 18.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2687360T | 10.04.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2687360T | 28.07.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2687360T | 31.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2687360T | 05.04.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | EP12176915 | 18.07.2012 |