EP2549057 - Apparatus and method for improved fluid sampling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Blvd. Houston, TX 77072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irani, Cyrus A. 7718 Stonesdale Drive Houston, TX Texas 77095 / US | 02 /
Proett, Mark A. 3611 Covey Drive Missouri City, TX Texas 77459 / US | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177063.0 | 19.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | US201113188616 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: US201113188616 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549057 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2549057 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B49/10 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
E21B49/10 (EP,US);
E21B49/081 (EP,US);
G01N2001/2057 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2013/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur verbesserten Flüssigkeitsprobenentnahme | [2013/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for improved fluid sampling | [2013/04] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'échantillonnage de fluide amélioré | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 04.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0903464 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [I] 1,9,16* paragraph [0127]; figure 4c *; | [Y]WO0050736 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [Y] 6,13 * page 6, line 26 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [I]US7197923 (WRIGHT ADAM D [US], et al) [I] 1,9,16 * column 11, line 4 - line 41; figure 6 *; | [IY]EP2067927 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [I] 1-5,7-12,14-20 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2b * * paragraph [0068]; figure 9b * [Y] 6,13 |