EP2514332 - Article of footwear with a sole structure having fluid-filled support elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Nike International Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodwin, David A. 5653 NW 180th Place Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
Crowley, Gerald 15810 SW Kittiwake Court Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
Goodwin, David A. 5653 NW 180th Place Portland, OR 97229 / US | ||
02 /
Crowley, Gerald 15810 S.W. Kittiwake Court Beaverton, OR 97229 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12177167.9 | 29.09.2006 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | US20050242607 | 03.10.2005 Original published format: US 242607 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514332 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2514332 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/18, A43B13/20, B29D35/14, A43B3/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A43B13/206 (EP,BR,US);
A43B13/181 (EP,BR,CN,US);
A43B3/00 (CN);
A43B13/20 (CN);
A43B3/0052 (EP,BR,US);
B29D35/122 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2012/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schuh mit einer mit Fluid gefüllten Stützelementen ausgestatteten Sohle | [2012/43] | English: | Article of footwear with a sole structure having fluid-filled support elements | [2012/43] | French: | Article de chaussure avec structure de semelle ayant des éléments de support remplis de fluide | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 08.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06851445.4 / EP1937097 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060851445) is 28.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2006 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IE | 29.09.2015 | LU | 29.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 29.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 29.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5224278 (JEON PIL D [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 4, line 3; figure - * [A] 3-5,9; | [A]US5343639 (KILGORE BRUCE J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, lines 15-21; figure - *; | [XA]WO9922160 (RETAMA TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 15 - page 19; figures 7-10,16 * [A] 3-5,8,9; | [XA]WO0170063 (NIKE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 4 - page 11; figure - * [A] 3-5,8,9; | [A]WO0170061 (NIKE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9* figure -; claim 1 *; | [XA]US2005028403 (SWIGART JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 46 - page 62; figure - * [A] 2-9 | by applicant | US4183156 | US4219945 | US4340626 | US4936029 | US5042176 | US5353459 | US5713141 | US5952065 | US6013340 | US6082025 | US6127026 | US6203868 | US6321465 |