13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
22.04.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
22.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
09.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.05.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.01.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
16.04.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
23.10.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|