Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8656608 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2014 | B2 | US2013000147 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213613323 | 13.09.2012 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | US82544910 | 29.06.2010 | US42543709 | 17.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8312643 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2011010962 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | US42544609 | 17.04.2009 | US89202410 | 28.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8302328 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2010263229 | 21.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | US82544910 | 29.06.2010 | US42543709 | 17.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8302234 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2009199955 | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42544009 | 17.04.2009 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7774955 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2010 | B2 | US2009199431 | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | US42543709 | 17.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7810256 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2010 | B2 | US2009193688 | 06.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | US42544609 | 17.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3037011 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B1 | EP3037011 | 29.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12177165 | 29.09.2006 | WO2006US38052 | 29.09.2006 | EP06851445 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2529637 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B1 | EP2529637 | 05.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06851445 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2514331 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B1 | EP2514331 | 24.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06851445 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1937097 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2013 | B1 | EP1937097 | 02.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US38052 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2514332 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | B1 | EP2514332 | 24.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06851445 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0616673 | 26.12.2017 | B1 | BRPI0616673 | 28.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US38052 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101309609B | 13.06.2012 | B | CN101309609 | 19.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US38052 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102657407B | 16.12.2015 | B | CN102657407 | 12.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680041396 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105249590B | 24.04.2020 | B | CN105249590 | 20.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680041396 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105455288B | 03.08.2018 | B | CN105455288 | 06.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680041396 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105455289B | 28.12.2018 | B | CN105455289 | 06.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680041396 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111296992B | 01.02.2022 | B | CN111296992 | 19.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680041396 | 29.09.2006 | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008020858 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A3 | WO2008020858 | 21.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7533477 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2009 | B2 | US2007074423 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI351931B | 11.11.2011 | B | TW200727805 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI411407B | 11.10.2013 | B | TW201012405 | 01.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI448253B | 11.08.2014 | B | TW201012406 | 01.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US24260705 | 03.10.2005 | Type | Earlier application | EP1937097 |