EP2515490 - Systems and methods for network routing in a multiple backbone network architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level 3 Communications, LLC 1025 Eldorado Boulevard Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence, Joseph 2989 Tin Cup Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 02 /
El-Aawar, Nassar 466 South Downing Street Denver, CO 80209 / US | 03 /
Loher, Darren 207 7th Avenue Kirkland, WA 98033-5530 / US | 04 /
White, Stephen Craig 22 Edgework Crescent London, NW4 4HG / GB | 05 /
Alcala, Raoul 1995 E Coalton Rd Apt. 19 104 Superior, CO 80027-4423 / US | 06 /
Comstedt, Niclas 2140 Newton Street Newton, CO 80211 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
Lawrence, Joseph 2989 Tin Cup Boulder, CO 80305 / US | ||
02 /
El-Aawar, Nassar 466 South Downing Street Denver, CO 80209 / US | |||
03 /
Loher, Darren 6554 Orion Court Arvada, CO 80007 / US | |||
04 /
White, Stephen Craig 22 Edgework Crescent London, NW4 4HG / GB | |||
05 /
Alcala, Raoul 1995 E Coalton Rd Apt. 19 104 Superior, CO 80027-4423 / US | |||
06 /
Comstedt, Niclas 2140 Newton Street Newton, CO 80211 / US | Representative(s) | Gwilt, Julia Louise, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Gwilt, Julia Louise, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12177337.8 | 05.02.2007 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | US20060565563 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 565563 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515490 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2515490 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/709, H04L12/771, H04L12/931, H04L12/933 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/60 (EP,US);
H04L49/1523 (EP,US);
H04L49/1569 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Netzverkehrslenkung in einer Netzwerkarchitektur | [2012/43] | English: | Systems and methods for network routing in a multiple backbone network architecture | [2012/43] | French: | Système et procédé de routage réseau dans une architecture de réseau | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07710455.2 / EP2087664 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070710455) is 15.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006084071 (LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * |