EP2517622 - Stylets for use with apparatus for intravascular placement of a catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, Jeremy B. 685 Eighth Avenue Salt Lake City, UT Utah 84103 / US | 02 /
Misener, Anthony K. 289 East 400 South Bountiful, 84010 UT Utah / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177438.4 | 29.09.2010 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US20090246957P | 29.09.2009 Original published format: US 246957 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2517622 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2517622 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/042, A61B8/08, A61B5/06, A61B19/00, A61M25/01 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/061 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP,US);
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/0841 (EP,US);
A61M25/0108 (EP,US);
A61M25/0127 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US);
A61B46/00 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B90/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | A61B5/042, A61B8/08, A61B5/06, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | Stillete zur Verwendung mit Vorrichtungen zur intravaskulären Positionierung eines Katheters | [2012/44] | English: | Stylets for use with apparatus for intravascular placement of a catheter | [2012/44] | French: | Stylets destinés à être utilisés avec un appareil de placement intravasculaire d'un cathéter | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10821193.9 / EP2482719 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007161915 (DESAI JAWAHAR M [US]) [Y] 1-7,12-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069] ** figures 1-2C *; | [Y]WO2008118992 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,12-15 * page 7, line 22 - page 7, line 24 * * page 10, line 20 - page 10, line 25 * * page 15, line 4 - page 15, line 13 * * page 18, line 7 - page 18, line 12 * * page 22, line 18 - page 23, line 6 * * figures 2-6,9 *; | [Y]WO2009070616 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * * figures 9-13A,17 * | by applicant | US5099845 | US5775322 | US5879297 | US6129668 | US6216028 | US6263230 | US20060466602 | US20090545762 |