EP2562544 - kits for use in the differentiation of IBD and IBS and further distinction between disease types of IBD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InDex Diagnostics AB Scheeles väg 2 171 77 Stockholm / SE | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Stein, Petra Karlbergsvägen 8 194 34 Upplands Väsby / SE | 02 /
Kouznetsov, Nikolai Kopparvägen 33 176 72 Järfälla / SE | 03 /
Von Stein, Oliver Karlbergsvägen 8 194 34 Upplands Väsby / SE | 04 /
Gielen, Alexander Gällerstagränd 11 124 76 Bandhagen / SE | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Holmberg, Martin Tor Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12177482.2 | 20.12.2007 | [2013/09] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007SE51057 | 20.12.2007 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562544 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
G01N2800/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Kit zur Verwendung bei der Differenzierung von IBD und IBS und der weiteren Unterscheidung zwischen IBD-Krankheitstypen | [2013/09] | English: | kits for use in the differentiation of IBD and IBS and further distinction between disease types of IBD | [2013/09] | French: | kit destinés à une utilisation dans la différentiation de IBD et IBS et dans la distinction complémentaire entre différents types de maladies IBD | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07861152.2 / EP2223121 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004241823 (DIECKMANN ANDREAS [SE], et al) [X] 1-17* claims 9-14 *; | [I]WO2006015742 (UNIV FRIEDRICH ALEXANDER ER [DE], et al) [I] 1-17 * seq.no.83= SLC26A2;; claim 30 *; | [T] - VON STEIN P ET AL, "Multigene Analysis Can Discriminate Between Ulcerative Colitis, Crohn's Disease, and Irritable Bowel Syndrome", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 134, no. 7, doi:10.1053/J.GASTRO.2008.02.083, ISSN 0016-5085, (20080601), pages 1869 - 1881, (20080302), XP022756831 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2008.02.083 | by applicant | US5691151 | US5830675 | US6033864 | WO0158927 | WO02055734 | WO03036262 | WO2004001073 | - BOSSUYT X., CLIN CHEM, (2006), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 171 - 181 | - SILVER ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, no. 31, pages 28528 - 32 | - BISHNUPURI ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2006), vol. 130, no. 1, pages 137 - 49 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - BOSSUYT, X., CLIN CHEM, (2006), vol. 52 | - KS BISHNUPURI LQ; N MURMU; C W HOUCHEN; S ANANT; B K DIECKGRAEFE, "Reg IV activates the epidermal growth factor receptor/Akt/AP-1 signaling pathway in colon adenocarcinomas", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2006), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2005.10.001, pages 137 - 49, XP005245687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2005.10.001 | - BOSSUYT X., "Serologic Markers in Inflammatory Bowel Disease", CLIN CHEM., (2006), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1373/clinchem.2005.058560, pages 171 - 181, XP002491953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2005.058560 | - HELLER ET AL., "Discovery and analysis of inflammatory disease-related genes using cDNA microarrays", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (19970318), vol. 94, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.94.6.2150, pages 2150 - 5, XP002171597 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.6.2150 | - HIRATA I; MURANO M; NITTA M; SASAKI S; TOSHINA K; MAEMURA K; KATSU K, "Estimation of mucosal inflammatory mediators in rat DSS-induced colitis. Possible role of PGE(2) in protection against mucosal damage", DIGESTION, (2001), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 73 - 80 | - ISAACS KL; SARTOR RB; HASKILL S, "Cytokine messenger RNA profiles in inflammatory bowel disease mucosa detected by polymerase chain reaction amplification", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1992), vol. 103, pages 1587 - 95, XP002969859 | - KEIICHI MITSUYAMA OT; NOBUO TOMIYASU; KOSEKU TAKAKI; ASUKA SUZUKI; JUNYA MASUDS; HIROSHI YAMASAKI; ATSUSHI TOYONAGA; MICHIO SATA, "Increased Circulating Concentrations of Growth-Related Oncogene (GRO)- a in Patients with Inflammatory Bowel Disease", DIGESTIVE DISEASES AND SCIENCES, (2006), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1007/s10620-006-3104-4, pages 173 - 77, XP019237548 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10620-006-3104-4 | - LAWRANCE IC; FIOCCHI C; CHAKRAVARTI S, "Ulcerative colitis and Crohn's disease: distinctive gene expression profiles and novel susceptibility candidate genes", HUM MOL GENET., (2001), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1093/hmg/10.5.445, pages 445 - 56, XP002501364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.5.445 | - NEWELL KJ ET AL., "Matrilysin (matrix metalloproteinase-7) expression in ulcerative colitis-related tumorigenesis", MOL CARCINOG., (200206), vol. 34, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1002/mc.10049, pages 59 - 63, XP002326007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mc.10049 | - PITARI G ET AL., "Pantetheinase activity of membrane-bound Vanin-1: lack of free cysteamine in tissues of Vanin-1 deficient mice", FEBS LETT., (20001020), vol. 483, no. 2-3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(00)02110-4, pages 149 - 54, XP004337693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)02110-4 | - SILVER DL; WANG N; VOGEL S., "Identification of Small PDZK1-associated Protein, DD96/MAP17, as a Regulator of PDZK1 and Plasma High Density Lipoprotein Levels", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, pages 28528 - 532 | - SPANDAU ET AL., "High expression of chemokines Gro-alpha (CXCL-1), IL-8 (CXCL-8), and MCP-1 (CCL-2) in inflamed human corneas in vivo", OPHTHALMOL, (200306), vol. 121, no. 6, pages 825 - 31 | - WOESSNER JF JR, "Regulation of matrilysin in the rat uterus", BIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (1996), vol. 74, no. 6, pages 777 - 84 |