EP2690637 - Connecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortinovis, Gianluca Via Monte Nigromo, 4 24021 Albino (BG) / IT | 02 /
Gasparini, Gabriele Via Ottavio Morlani, 11/S 24052 Azzano San Paolo (BG) / IT | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Crugnola, Pietro, et al Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 12177501.9 | 23.07.2012 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690637 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/42, H01H31/00 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H01H1/42 (EP);
H01H31/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anschlussvorrichtung | [2014/05] | English: | Connecting device | [2014/05] | French: | Dispositif de connexion | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 04.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1665986 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,5,8,11-14 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-4; claim 4 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,9,10; | [XY]DD133875 (WOLDMANN GERD, et al) [X] 1-4,12-14 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-11; | [Y]DE69510154T (GEC ALSTHOM T & D SA [FR]) [Y] 3,4,6,7 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 14, paragraph 3; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US8197289 (FABER TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [Y] 5-11 * column 4, line 58 - column 12, line 56; figures 2-13 * |