EP2572902 - Pneumatic tire and manufacturing method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | Pneumatic tire and manufacturing method of the same | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8661 / JP | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Toyo Tire & Rubber Co. Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinkai, Akihiko Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 550-8661 / JP | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/13] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178010.0 | 26.07.2012 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | JP20110206346 | 21.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011206346 | JP20120006361 | 16.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012006361 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2572902 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572902 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/08, B60C11/00, B29D30/60, B29D30/52 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B60C19/082 (EP,US);
B29D30/52 (EP,US);
B29D30/60 (EP,US);
B60C11/005 (EP,US);
B60C11/0304 (US);
B60C13/00 (US);
B60C15/00 (US);
B60C19/08 (EP,US);
B60C19/084 (EP,US);
B60C19/086 (US);
B60C19/088 (US);
B60C9/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | B60C19/08, B60C11/00, B29D30/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | Luftreifen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2014/45] | English: | Pneumatic tire and manufacturing method of the same | [2014/45] | French: | Pneu et son procédé de fabrication | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/13] | Luftreifen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2013/13] | Pneumatic tire and manufacturing method of the same | ||
Former [2013/13] | Pneu et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 04.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 13.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2012 | AL | 05.11.2014 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MK | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | RS | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 26.07.2015 | LU | 26.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MK | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.07.2012 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.07.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2009126291 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [AD] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US2009314401 (HITOTSUYANAGI MITSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0018] - [0041]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2010115935 | JP2009126291 | JP2010264920 |