EP2522672 - Oxidized phospholipids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vascular Biogenics Ltd. 6 Jonathan Netanyahu Street 60376 Or Yehuda / IL | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halperin, Gideon 6 HaTomer Street 90836 Har-adar / IL | 02 /
Kovalevski-Ishai, Eti 68 Sokolov Street 42255 Netania / IL | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178298.1 | 02.01.2008 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US20070650973 | 09.01.2007 Original published format: US 650973 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2522672 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/02, A61K31/66 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C07F9/106 (EP,US);
C07B41/00 (US);
C07C29/48 (US);
C07C41/26 (US);
C07C45/27 (US);
C07C45/29 (US);
C07C51/16 (US);
C07C51/29 (US);
C07C67/08 (US);
C07C67/28 (US);
C07C67/39 (US);
C07F9/091 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Oxidierte Phospholipide | [2012/46] | English: | Oxidized phospholipids | [2012/46] | French: | Phospholipides oxydés | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 05.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08700247.3 / EP2125838 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080700247) is 14.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003225035 (HARATS DROR [IL], et al) | by applicant | US4329302 | CH642665 | US4614796 | US4778912 | US4827011 | WO9523592 | US5561052 | US5660855 | US5985292 | US6017513 | US6261597 | WO2004106486 | US6838452 | US6838425 | US20010806400 |