Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013083351 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113249930 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5681140B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | B2 | JP2013080452 | 02.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113249930 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103034463B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B | CN103034463 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113249930 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2575025 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP2575025 | 06.11.2013 | A3 | EP2575025 | 03.04.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113249930 | 30.09.2011 |