EP2551312 - Method of reusably separating two adhered plates and apparatus used for the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Masato c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Hirao, Akira c/o Nitto Denko Corporation, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178500.0 | 30.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | JP20110165943 | 28.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011165943 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2551312 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, B32B43/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
C09J5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B43/006 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J7/30 (KR);
C09J7/38 (KR);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
C09J2203/318 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/302 (KR);
C09J2301/40 (KR);
C09J2301/50 (KR);
C09J2301/502 (EP,US);
C09J2483/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1702 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum wieder nutzbaren Trennen von zwei anhaftenden Platten und Vorrichtung hierfür | [2013/05] | English: | Method of reusably separating two adhered plates and apparatus used for the method | [2013/05] | French: | Procédé pour séparer deux plaques collées de façon à pouvoir les réutiliser et appareil utilisé pour le procédé | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2013 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010129658 (SUZUKI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0099]; example -; claims 1,3,5-9 * [Y] 1-9; | [D]JP2010121134 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [D] * abstract *; | [XY]US5869150 (IWAMOTO MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 10 * example 1; claims 1,2,5 * [Y] 1-9; | [X]EP1894662 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 10 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2010121134 | JPH09157582 | JPH11217558 | JP2000144097 | JP2005290323 | JP2007145884 | JP2008156454 | JP2005054029 | JP2008088323 | JP2006124417 | JP2008266473 | JP2003013015 |