12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
11.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
26.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
01.01.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
18.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
30.01.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.01.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.01.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.08.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
03.01.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
06.06.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|