Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014019726 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12178533 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2692460 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2015 | B1 | EP2692460 | 05.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12178533 | 30.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201412431 | 01.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12178533 | 30.07.2012 |