EP2521419 - Method and device for message handling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Liangliang c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Chen, Zhuo c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Li, Yajuan c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 04 /
Chang, Junren c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 05 /
Wang, Yan c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | 06 /
Peng, Yan c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2015/23] |
Former [2012/45] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178968.9 | 30.09.2010 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: CN201010165454 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: PCT/CN2009/074338 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2521419 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2521419 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04W92/00, H04W36/00 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP,US);
H04W36/0061 (US);
H04B7/15507 (US);
H04W36/0079 (EP,US);
H04W92/14 (US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Nachrichtenhandhabung | [2012/45] | English: | Method and device for message handling | [2012/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement de messages | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10819919.1 / EP2472998 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100819919) is 24.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2010 | AL | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | MK | 03.06.2015 | MT | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | SM | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MK | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | BE | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2139257 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0013] - [0020] - [0 35] , [0 38] - [0040] *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090901), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 165, XP050377587 [X] 1-7 * §19.2.2.5 §20.2 §20.2.2 §20.2.2.6 §22.3.2a §22.3.3 * | [X] - HUAWEI, "Specific cause value for X2 handover preparation failure", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080750_CAUSE FOR X2 HO PREP FAILURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG3, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050163958 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS) enhancements for Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN) access (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090601), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 234, XP050363632 [X] 1-7 * §4.3.7.2 §5.5.1.1 §5.5.2.1 * | Examination | WO2008134962 | - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Overall Study of X2 IF necessity in Relay Architecture", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093286_X2IF_RELAY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), no. San Francisco, USA; 20090428, XP050340956 |