19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
08.04.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
04.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
09.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
29.04.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.12.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2013 |
First examination report |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.11.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
05.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
06.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|