Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011038690 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011038551 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016295468 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213435815 | 30.03.2012 | WO2010CN77513 | 30.09.2010 | US201615176463 | 08.06.2016 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9414271 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | B2 | US2012294227 | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213562026 | 30.07.2012 | US201213435815 | 30.03.2012 | WO2010CN77513 | 30.09.2010 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9414270 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | B2 | US2012190368 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010CN77513 | 30.09.2010 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2472998 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B1 | EP2472998 | 04.07.2012 | A4 | EP2472998 | 04.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010CN77513 | 30.09.2010 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102781048B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B | CN102781048 | 14.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210264302 | 30.04.2010 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102202395B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2012 | B | CN102202395 | 28.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102196480B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B | CN102196480 | 21.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201110077975 | 30.04.2010 | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2521419 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2015 | B1 | EP2521419 | 07.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74338 | 30.09.2009 | EP10819919 | 30.09.2010 | CN201010165454 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2472998 |