EP2575149 - Joining structures, electrical contacts, and their manufacturing means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Shigeru c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Takashi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Morita, Ayumu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Okamoto, Kazutaka c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Yabu, Masato c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Tsuchiya, Kenji c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12179082.8 | 02.08.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | JP20110210080 | 27.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011210080 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575149 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575149 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/02, H01H11/04, H01H33/664 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H01H11/048 (EP);
H01H1/06 (KR);
H01H33/664 (EP,KR);
H01H1/0206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsstrukturen, elektrische Kontakte und ihre Herstellungsmittel | [2013/14] | English: | Joining structures, electrical contacts, and their manufacturing means | [2013/14] | French: | Structures de jonction, contacts électriques et moyens de fabrication associés | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 08.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0917171 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11-13 * paragraphs [0059] - [0122] * * figures 1-20 * [Y] 4,8,9; | [X]DE3107688 (CALOR EMAG ELEKTRIZITAETS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,10-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5691521 (KOMURO KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column 8, lines 16-36 * * column 9, line 37 - column 19, line 7 * * figures 5-13 *; | [Y]DE19809306 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3842919 (CALOR EMAG ELEKTRIZITAETS AG [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 4; claim 6 * | by applicant | JP2007157666 |