EP2535670 - Air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Bldg. 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuoka, Hiromune c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | 02 /
Shimoda, Junichi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Kenji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | 04 /
Mizutani, Kazuhide c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | [2014/09] |
Former [2012/51] | 01 /
Matsuoka, Hiromune c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimoda, Junichi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Kenji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | |||
04 /
Mizutani, Kazuhide c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Sakai Plant Kanaoka Factory 1304 Kanaoka-cho, Kita-ku, Sakai-shi Osaka, 591-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12179193.3 | 10.06.2005 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | JP20040173839 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004173839 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535670 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535670 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535670 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B49/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25B49/02 (KR);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2313/02331 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0314 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0315 (EP,US);
F25B2500/19 (EP,US);
F25B2600/19 (EP,US);
F25B2600/21 (EP,US);
F25B2700/04 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1931 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | Klimaanlage | [2012/51] | English: | Air conditioner | [2012/51] | French: | Climatiseur | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 11.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05748984.1 / EP1775532 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050748984) is 10.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2005 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5214918 (OGUNI KENSAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * column 7, line 63 - column 10, line 60 * [A] 4; | [XA]JP2000304388 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * abstract *[A] 4; | [E]WO2005093345 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [E] 1 * the whole document * |