EP2523052 - Storage medium with a computer generated reflection hologram on a non-planar surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa scribos GmbH Sickingenstrasse 65 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheibenstock, Steffen, Dr. Vogelsangstraße 68 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Borgsmüller, Stefan Lahrer Str. 22 69126 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | 01 /
Scheibenstock, Steffen, Dr. Vogelsangstraße 68 70197 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Borgsmüller, Stefan Lahrer Str. 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [2012/46] | 01 /
Scheibenstock, Steffen, Dr. Vogelsangstraße 68 70197 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Borgsmüller, Stefan Landhausstr. 2a 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12179395.4 | 22.02.2006 | [2012/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523052 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/08, G03H1/22 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G03H1/0808 (EP,US);
G03H2270/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Speichermedium mit einem computergenerierten Reflektionshologramm auf einer unebenen Fläche | [2012/46] | English: | Storage medium with a computer generated reflection hologram on a non-planar surface | [2012/46] | French: | Support de stockage doté d'un hologramme numérique réfléchissant sur une surface non-plane | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 04.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/38] | 02.05.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06003545.8 / EP1826632 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060003545) is 27.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001142379 ; | [I] - FRERE C, "RECONSTRUCTION IN INCLINED PLANES OF CURVED COMPUTER GENERATED HOLOGRAMS", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19901110), vol. 29, no. 32, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 4761 - 4765, XP000162132 [I] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.29.004761 | [A] - ROSEN J, "Computer-generated holograms of images reconstructed on curved surfaces", APPLIED OPTICS OPT. SOC. AMERICA USA, (19991010), vol. 38, no. 29, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 6136 - 6140, XP002399657 [A] 1 * figures 4,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.38.006136 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001142379 A 20010525 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO02079881 | WO02079883 | WO02084404 | WO02084405 | WO02084588 | DE10137832 | WO03012549 | WO03014837 | DE10236891 | WO2005111913 |