EP2522233 - Dietary fiber composition comprising glucomannan, xanthan gum, alginate and lipid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inovobiologic, Inc. 104 - 1240 Kensington Road N-W Suite 409 Calgary, Alberta T2N 4X7 / CA | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gahler, Roland J. 3655 Bonneville Place Burnaby British Columbia V3N 4S9 / CA | 02 /
Lyon, Michael 3351 Ross Road Nanaimo British Columbia V9T 2S3 / CA | 03 /
Lee, Nicole 1699 Milford Avenue Coquitlam British Columbia V3J 2V9 / CA | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12179590.0 | 29.07.2008 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US20070830615 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: US 830615 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522233 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522233 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522233 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/21, A23L29/00, A23L2/52, A23L29/269, A23L29/256, A23L29/244, A23D7/005, A61K47/36, A61P3/04 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
A23L29/244 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/27 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/723 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/46] | A23L1/308, A23L1/30, A23L2/52, A23L1/054, A23L1/0532, A23L1/0528, A23D7/005, A61K47/36, A61P3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2012/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ballaststoffzusammensetzung umfassend glucomannan, xanthan-gummi, alginat und lipid | [2015/45] | English: | Dietary fiber composition comprising glucomannan, xanthan gum, alginate and lipid | [2012/46] | French: | Composition de fibres diététiques comprenant du glucomannan, de la gomme de xanthane, de l'alginate et des lipides | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/46] | Ballaststoffzusammensetzung umfassend Glucomannan, Xanthan-gummi, Alginat und Lipid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 07.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08783306.7 / EP2182817 | Divisional application(s) | EP16164971.0 / EP3090636 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2008 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | LU | 29.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.07.2008 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
LU | 29.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006108283 (NATURAL FACTORS NUTRITIONAL PR [CA], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I] - VUKSAN VLADIMIR ET AL, "Viscosity rather than quantity determines lipid lowering effects of dietary fiber in individuals consuming typical North American diet", FASEB JOURNAL; EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 2006 MEETING, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, (20060301), vol. 20, no. 5, Part 2, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1027, XP008146994 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - KIEFER, "Novel Fiber Limits Sugar Absorption", LIFE EXTENSION, HOLLYWOOD, FL, US, (20040901), ISSN 1524-198X, pages 25 - 37, XP003002101 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005020535 | - YIP ET AL., OBESITY RES., (2001), vol. 9, pages 341S - 347S | - LUDWIG ET AL., PEDIATRICS, (1999), vol. 103, no. 3, page E26 | - STRACHAN ET AL., PHYSIOL. BEHAV., (2004), vol. 80, no. 5, pages 675 - 82 | - SCHULTES ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METABOL., (2003), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 1133 - 41 | - YLONEN ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (2003), vol. 26, pages 1979 - 85 | - MARCIANI ET AL., AM. J PHYSIOL. GASTROINTEST. LIVER PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 280, pages G1227 - 33 | - PERRY & CHILTON, Chemical Engineers Handbook(5th ed.,, UNKNOWN | - KRAUSS ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 1, no. 18, pages 2284 - 99 | - STEVENS ET AL., AM. J. CLIN.. NUTR., (1987), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 812 - 7 | - BLUNDELL; BURLEY, INT. J. OBES., (1987), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 9 - 25 | - HOWARTH ET AL., NUTR. REV., (2001), vol. 59, no. 5, pages 129 - 39 | - SALMERON ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (1997), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 545 - 50 | - SALMERON ET AL., JAMA, (1997), vol. 277, no. 6, pages 462 - 77 | - JENKINS ET AL., LANCET, (1967), vol. 2, no. 7999, page 1251 | - DOI ET AL., LANCET, (1979), vol. 1, no. 8123, pages 987 - 8 | - SHIMA ET AL., NUTR. REP. INT., (1982), vol. 26, pages 297 - 302 | - BRAND ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (1991), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 95 - 101 | - WOLEVER ET AL., DIABET. MED., (1992), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 451 - 8 | - JENKINS ET AL., LANCET, (1977), vol. 2, no. 8042, pages 779 - 80 | - ARO ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (1981), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 29 - 33 | - VUKSAN ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (2000), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 9 - 14 | - CHIASSON ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (1996), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 1190 - 3 | - FROST ET AL., METABOLISM, (1998), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 1245 - 51 | - MEYER, ANN. NYACAD. SCI., (1955), vol. 63, pages 15 - 32 | - PENICAUD ET AL., CURR. OPIN. CLIN. NUTR. METAB. CARE, (2002), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 539 - 43 | - MATSUDA; DEFRONZO, DIABETES CARE, (1999), vol. 22, pages 1462 - 70 | - SHAMLIYAN ET AL., J FAM. PRACT., (2006), vol. 55, pages 761 - 9 | - JENKINS ET AL., AM. J. CLIN. NUTR., (2006), vol. 83, pages 582 - 91 | - RITISHAUSER, SWISS MED. WKLY, (2006), vol. 136, pages 41 - 9 | - KUO ET AL., INT. J. CLIN. PRACT, (2006), vol. 60, no. 8, pages 906 - 10 | - DIXON, AUSTRALIAN FAM. PHYS., (2006), vol. 35, pages 576 - 79 | - FERRARO ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 90, pages 780 - 784 | - VILLAREAL ET AL., AM. J. CLIN. NUTR., (2005), vol. 82, pages 923 - 34 | - POLANSKY ET AL., J. CLIN. INVESTIG., (1998), vol. 28, no. 2, pages 3 - 6 | - LAMOUNIER-ZEPTER ET AL., BEST PRACT. RES. CLIN. ENDOCRIN. METABOL., (2006), vol. 20, pages 355 - 367 |