EP2557538 - Image measurement apparatus and image measurement method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurihara, Masaki c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12179839.1 | 09.08.2012 | [2013/07] | Priority number, date | JP20110175755 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011175755 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2557538 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2557538 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/60 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G01B11/005 (US);
G06T2207/20016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20061 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20092 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildmessungsgerät und Bildmessungsverfahren | [2013/07] | English: | Image measurement apparatus and image measurement method | [2013/07] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la mesure d'image | [2013/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 26.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 17.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/51] | 30.07.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1653408 (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - MITUTOYO, "QVPAK - 3D CNC vision measuring Machine - User's guide - Version 7", INTERNET CITATION, (2003), URL: http://www2.mitutoyo.de, (20071119), XP007903535 [A] 1-4 * page 33 * * page 48 * * pages 1,34,48 * | by applicant | JPH08247719 |