Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2535072
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.04.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
09.01.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.08.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.05.2013 |
First examination report |
|
01.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.02.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
22.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
18.12.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
16.11.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
17.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|