Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005273076 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14680705 | 07.06.2005 | US57765804 | 07.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008501483 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US19949 | 07.06.2005 | US57765804 | 07.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1768724 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2010 | A4 | EP1768724 | 04.04.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US19949 | 07.06.2005 | US57765804 | 07.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2535072 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2013 | A3 | EP2535072 | 19.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57765804 | 07.06.2004 | EP05757206 | 07.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005120623 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2007 | A3 | WO2005120623 | 22.12.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57765804 | 07.06.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1768724 |