EP2561802 - Occupant support suite and method for responding to an acoustic signature of a stand alone device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penninger, Jason A 5846 Forest Lane Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 02 /
Hornbach, David W 12161 County Line Road Brookville, IN 47012 / US | 03 /
O'Keefe, Christopher R 318 Coonhunters Road Batesville, IN 47006 / US | 04 /
Receveur, Timothy Joseph 4646 Heritage Trail Guilford, IN 47022 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12180438.9 | 14.08.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | US201113214467 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: US201113214467 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2561802 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2561802 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G08B21/02, A61G7/018, G06Q50/24, G06F19/00 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B5/6891 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61G7/001 (EP,US);
A61G7/05776 (EP,US);
A61G7/008 (EP,US);
A61G7/015 (EP,US);
A61G7/018 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0146 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0184 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5002 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5097 (EP,US);
A61H2209/00 (EP,US);
A61H23/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Insassenträger-Suite und Verfahren zur Reaktion auf eine akustische Signatur einer eigenständigen Vorrichtung | [2013/09] | English: | Occupant support suite and method for responding to an acoustic signature of a stand alone device | [2013/09] | French: | Suite de support d'occupant et procédé permettant de répondre à une signature acoustique d'un dispositif autonome | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2008018435 (BROWN HOUSTON [US]) [I] 1,2,4-8,15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0024] - [0027] - [0037]; figures 4-7; claim 6 * [Y] 3,9-14; | [Y]EP1975750 (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US]) [Y] 3,9-14 * paragraphs [0064] , [0082] , [0127] , [0183]; figures 1,9-14 *; | [I]US2006017558 (ALBERT DAVID E [US], et al) [I] 1-8,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0031] - [0028]; figures 1-3 * |