Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
08.04.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.10.2014 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
10.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
01.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2014 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
29.11.2013 | First examination report | |
27.11.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
26.07.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |