EP2548880 - Compositions for increasing telomerase activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telomerase Activation Sciences, Inc. 420 Lexington Ave, Suite 2900 New York 10170 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states GERON CORPORATION 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halrley, Calvin B. 1730 University Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Chin, Allison C. 1060 Campus Drive East Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 03 /
Akama, Tsutomu 832 Azure Street Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
Ip, Nancy Yuk-yu Repulse Bay Towers, Apt. 7A 119A Repulse Bay Road Kowloon / HK | 05 /
Wong, Yung-hou, Ph.D. Associate Professor, Dept of Biolochemistry Assoc. Director, Biotechnology Research Institute Hong Kong University Science & Technology Clear Water Bay, Kowloon / HK | 06 /
Miller-Martini, David M., Dr. 409 Pine Street Ridgway, PA 15853 / US | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/04] | 01 /
Halrley, Calvin B 1730 University Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | ||
02 /
Chin, Allison C. 1060 Campus Drive East Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
03 /
Akama, Tsutomu 832 Azure Street Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
04 /
Ip, Nancy Yuk-yu Repulse Bay Towers, Apt. 7A 119A Repulse Bay Road Kowloon / US | |||
05 /
Wong, Yung-hou, PhD@Associate Professor, Dept of Biolochemistry Assoc. Director, Biotechnology Research Institute Hong Kong University Science & Technology Clear Water Bay, Kowloon / US | |||
06 /
Miller-Martini, David M., Dr. 409 Pine Street Ridgway, PA 15853 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12180710.1 | 23.06.2004 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | US20030480988P | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 480988 P | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2548880 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2548880 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2548880 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/58, A61K31/56, A61K31/7048, A61K36/481, C07J1/00, A61P31/12, A61P25/00, A61P19/00, A61P27/02, A61P9/10, A61P7/06, A61P17/00, A61P17/02 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
C07J3/00 (KR);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (KR);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K36/481 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07J1/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | C07J1/00, A61K31/56, A61K31/7048, A61P31/12, A61P25/00, A61P19/00, A61P27/02, A61P9/10, A61P7/06, A61P17/00, A61P17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2013/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 19.12.2013 | HR | 19.12.2013 | LT | 19.12.2013 | LV | 19.12.2013 | MK | 19.12.2013 | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen zur Erhöhung der Telomeraseaktivität | [2013/04] | English: | Compositions for increasing telomerase activity | [2013/04] | French: | Compositions pour augmenter l'activité de la télomérase | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 17.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04777032.6 / EP1644009 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040777032) is 11.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6212792 (OSAKA CHEM LAB) [X] 1-5,8,9,12,14 * abstract * * page 7, column l, line 18 - column r, line 20 * * page 9, column r, line 21 - page 10, column r, line l; table . * [I] 13; | [XD]US5770578 (BINDER BERND [AT], et al) [XD] 1-5,8-10,12,13 * column 2, lines 35-47 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 63 * * claims 1-2 *; | [XD]WO0101996 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) [XD] 1-6,8-10,12-14 * claims 1,10, 18, 22 * * page 4, lines 1-5 *; | [XI]CN1283462 (ZHONGSHAN HOSPITAL ATTACHED TO [CN]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line l * [I] 13; | [X]US2002164387 (WEI KAIYUAN [US], et al) [X] 4-6,8,12-14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 37] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 47] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [XI]CN1403470 (SHANGHAI TRADITIONAL CHINESE M [CN]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line l * [I] 13; | [XP]CN1470241 (ZHENGDA TIANQING PHARMACEUTICA [CN]) [XP] 1-5,8-14 * claims 1-3 *; | [E]WO2004096251 (WESTLAKE PARTNERS [US]) [E] 12-14 * claims 1-6 *; | [X] - LI C-X ET AL, "Effects of Buyang Huanwu decoction and its active constituents on the fluidity of brain cell membrane in vitro", ZHONGGUO YAOXUE ZAZHI - CHINESE PHARMACEUTICAL JOURNAL, GAI KAN BIAN-WEI-HUI, BEIJING, CN, (20010801), vol. 36, no. 8, ISSN 1001-2494, pages 528 - 531, XP008119507 [X] 1-5,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * page 529, column r, paragraph 3 * * table 1 * | [X] - LUO H M ET AL, "Nuclear cardiology study on effective ingredients of Astragalus membranaceus in treating heart failure", CHUNG-KUO CHUNG HSI I CHIEH HO TSA CHIH - ZHONGGUO ZHONGXIYIJIEHE ZAZHE - CHINESE JOURNAL OF INTEGRATED TRADITIONAL ANDWESTERN MEDICINE, BEIJING, CN, (19951201), vol. 15, no. 12, ISSN 1003-5370, pages 707 - 709, XP008119506 [X] 1-5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * | [X] - PAN FEI YANG JUN-SHAN ET AL, "Studies on triterpenoids of Astragalus floridus", ACTA BOTANICA SINICA, ZHIWU XUEBAO, KEXUE CHUBANSHE, CN, (19960101), vol. 38, no. 10, ISSN 0577-7496, pages 836 - 838, XP008119504 [X] 1-5,8,9,12,13 * abstract * * compounds 2, 5 * * table 1 * | [X] - KAO SHUNG-TE ET AL, "The Chinese medicine Bu-Zhong-Yi-Qi-Tang inhibited proliferation of hepatoma cell lines by inducing apoptosis via G0/G1 arrest", LIFE SCIENCES, (20010817), vol. 69, no. 13, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1485 - 1496, XP055061975 [X] 1-6,8,9,12-14 * abstract * * page 1486, paragraph 1 * * table 1 * * figure 3 * | [XD] - BEDIR E ET AL, "Immunostimulatory Effects of Cycloartane-Type Triterpene Glycosides from Astragalus Species", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (20000101), vol. 32, no. 7, doi:10.1248/BPB.23.834, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 834 - 837, XP007919860 [XD] 4-6,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * page 834, column l, paragraph 1 * * compounds 12, 17, 18 * * page 836, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.23.834 | [XI] - KITAGAWA I ET AL, "SAPONIN AND SAPOGENOL 34. CHEMICAL CONSTITUENTS OF ASTRAGALI RADIX THE ROOT OF ASTRAGALUS-MEMBRANACEUS 1. CYCLO ASTRAGENOL THE 9 19 CYCLO LANOSTANE TYPE AGLYCONE OF ASTRAGALOSIDES AND THE ARTIFACT AGLYCONE ASTRAGENOL", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (TOKYO), (1983), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 689 - 697, XP055061283 [X] 4-6,8,9,12,14 * abstract * * compounds 1, 5 * * page 689, paragraph 1 * * page 689, paragraph l - page 690, paragraph 1 * [I] 13 | [XDYI] - ZHANG WEI-JIAN ET AL, "Regulation of the fibrinolytic potential of cultured human umbilical vein endothelial cells: Astragaloside IV downregulates plasminogen activator inhibitor-1 and upregulates tissue-type plasminogen activator expression", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 1018-1172, pages 273 - 280, XP008162031 [XD] 4-6,8,9,12,14 * abstract * * page 274, column r, paragraph 3 * * figures 2, 3 * * page 277, column r, paragraph 4 - page 278, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 279, column l, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-5,8,9,11 [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000159234 | [XI] - ABDALLAH R M ET AL, "ASTRAGALOSIDES FROM EGYPTIAN ASTRAGALUS SPINOSUS VAHL", DIE PHARMAZIE, GOVI VERLAG PHARMAZEUTISCHER VERLAG GMBH, ESCHBORN, DE, (19930101), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 452 - 454, XP001160860 [X] 12 * abstract * * page 454, column l, paragraphs 2-3; figure . * * compound 4 * [I] 13 | [Y] - MORISAKI NOBUHIRO ET AL, "Mechanism of angiogenic effects of saponin from Ginseng Radix rubra in human umbilical vein endothelial cells", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1995), vol. 115, no. 7, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1188 - 1193, XP055062495 [Y] 1-5,8,9,11 * abstract * * page 1189, column l, paragraph l * * figures 3-5, 7 * * page 1192, column l, paragraph 1 * | [A] - IONKOVA I ET AL, "Cycloartane saponin production in hairy root cultures of Astragalus mongholicus", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (19970801), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 1597 - 1600, XP004293321 [A] 1-10,12-14 * page 1597, column l, paragraph 1 * * compound 2 * * page 1599, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(97)00247-1 | [T] - FAUCE STEVEN RUSSELL ET AL, "Telomerase-Based Pharmacologic Enhancement of Antiviral Function of Human CD8(+) T Lymphocytes", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200811), vol. 181, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 7400 - 7406, XP002570921 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - YUNG LISA Y ET AL, "Astragaloside IV and Cycloastragenol Stimulate the Phosphorylation of Extracellular Signal-Regulated Protein Kinase in Multiple Cell Types", PLANTA MEDICA, (201201), vol. 78, no. 2, pages 115 - 121, XP055062190 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - HARLEY CALVIN B ET AL, "A natural product telomerase activator as part of a health maintenance program.", REJUVENATION RESEARCH FEB 2011, (201102), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1557-8577, pages 45 - 56, XP055062170 [T] * abstract * * page 46, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/rej.2010.1085 | by applicant | JPS6212791 | US5583016 | US5629154 | US5770578 | US5891639 | WO9935243 | US6007989 | WO0008135 | WO0031238 | US6093809 | US6166178 | WO0101996 | WO0118015 | US6261836 | WO0192289 | WO0207732 | WO02069980 | WO02091999 | EP1295893 | - ALLSOPP, R.C. ET AL., "Telomere shortening is associated with cell division in vitro and in vivo", EXP. CELL RES., (199509), vol. 220, no. 1, pages 194 - 200 | - BODNAR, A.G. ET AL., "Extension of life-span by introduction of telomerase into normal human cells", SCIENCE, (19980116), vol. 279, no. 5349, pages 349 - 52 | - CHIU, C.P. ET AL., "Replicative senescence and cell immortality: the role oftelomeres and telomerase", PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (199702), vol. 214, no. 2, pages 99 - 106 | - DAGARAG, M. ET AL., "Differential impairment of lytic and cytokine functions in senescent human immunodeficiency virus type 1-specific cytotox T lymphocytes", J. VIROL., (200303), vol. 77, no. 5, pages 3077 - 83 | - FARWELL, D.G. ET AL., "Genetic and epigenetic changes in human epithelial cells immortalized by telomerase", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200005), vol. 156, no. 5, pages 1537 - 47 | - FUJIMOTO, R. ET AL., "Expression of telomerase components in oral keratinocytes and squamous cell carcinomas", ORAL ONCOLOGY, (200102), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 132 - 40 | - FUNK, WALTER D. ET AL., "Telomerase expression restores derrnal integrity to in vitro- aged fibroblasts in a reconstituted skin model", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (20000801), vol. 258, no. 2, pages 270 - 278 | - HARLE-BACHOR, C. ET AL., "Telomerase activity in the regenerative basal layer of the epidermis inhuman skin and in immortal and carcinoma-derived skin keratinocytes", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (19960625), vol. 93, no. 13, pages 6476 - 81 | - HARLEY, C.B. ET AL., "Telomeres shorten during ageing of human fibroblasts", NATURE, (19900531), vol. 345, no. 6274, pages 458 - 60 | - HARLEY, C.B. ET AL., "Telomerase, cell immortality, and cancer", COLD SPRING HARB. SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1994), vol. 59, pages 307 - 15 | - HARLEY, C.B. ET AL., "Telomeres and telomerase in aging and cancer", CURR. OPIN GENET. DEV., (199504), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 249 - 55 | - HARLEY, C.B. ET AL., "Telomerase and cancer", IMPORTANT ADV. ONCOL., (1996), pages 57 - 67 | - HARLEY, C.B., "Human aging and telomeres", CIBA FOUND. SYMP., (1997), vol. 211, pages 129 - 39 | - HARLEY, C.B., "Telomerase is not an oncogene", ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 494 - 502 | - HENDERSON, S. ET AL., "In situ analysis of changes in telomere size during replicative aging and cell transformation", J. CELL BIOL., (19960719), vol. 134, no. 1, pages 1 - 12 | - JIANG, X.R. ET AL., "Telomerase expression in human somatic cells does not induce changes associated with a transformed phenotype", NATURE GENETICS, (199901), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 111 - 4 | - KANG, M.K. ET AL., "Replicative senescence of normal human oral keratinocytes is associated with the loss of telomerase activity without shortening of telomeres", CELL GROWTH & DIFFERETITIATIAN, (199801), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 85 - 95 | - LEE, K.M. ET AL., "Immortalization with telomerase of the Nestin-positive cells of the human pancreas", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (20030221), vol. 301, no. 4, pages 1038 - 44 | - LUDWIG, A. ET AL., "Ribozyme cleavage of telomerase mRNA sensitizes breast epithelial cells to inhibitors oftopoisomerase", CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, pages 3053 - 3061 | - MATTSON, M.P., "Emerging neuroprotective strategies for Alzheimer's disease: dietary restriction, telomerase activation, and stem cell therapy", EXP GERONTOL., (200007), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 489 - 502 | - MORALES, C. P. ET AL., "Absence of cancer-associated changes in human fibroblasts immortalized with telomerase", NATURE GENETICS, (199901), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 115 - 8 | - OH, H.; SCHNEIDER, M.D., "The emerging role of telomerase in cardiac muscle cell growth and survival", J MOL CELL CARDIOL, (200207), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 7 17 - 24 | - SIMONSEN, J.L. ET AL., "Telomerase expression extends the proliferative life-span and maintains the osteogenic potential of human bone marrow stromal cells", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (200206), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 592 - 6 | - THOMAS, M.; YANG, L.; HORNSBY, P.J., "Forrnation of functional tissue from transplanted adrenocortical cells expressing telomerase reverse transcriptase", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (200001), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 39 - 42 | - VASA, M. ET AL., "Nitric oxide activates telomerase and delays endothelial cell senescence", CIRC. RES., (2000), vol. 87, no. 7, pages 540 - 542 | - YANG, J. ET AL., "Telomerized human microvasculature is functional in vivo", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY (UNITED STATES, (200103), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 219 - 24 | - YANG, J. ET AL., "Human endothelial cell life extension by telomerase expression", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19990910), vol. 274, no. 37, pages 26141 - 8 | - YUDOH, K. ET AL., "Reconstituting telomerase activity using the telomerase catalytic subunit prevents the telomere shorting and replicative senescence in human osteoblasts", J. BONE AND MINERAL RES., (2001), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 1453 - 1464 | - BEDIR, E. ET AL., "Immunostimulatory effects of cycloartane-type triterpene glycosides from Astragalus species", BIOL & PHARM BULL, (2000), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 834 - 7 | - CALZADA, L. ET AL., "Effect oftetracyclic triterpenes (argentatins A, B and D) on the estradiol receptor of hormone-dependent tumors of human breast", MEDICAL SCIENCE RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 815 - 16 | - CHEN, X. ET AL., "Protective effect of ginsenoside Rg1 on dopamin-induced apoptotis in PC12 cells", ACTA PHARMACOL SINICA, (2001), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 673 - 678 | - HONG, H.-Y. ET AL., "Stimulatory effects of ginsenoside-Rg1 on p56lck kinase and cell proliferation in Jurkat T cells", KOREAN J. GINSENG SCI., (1995), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 117 - 21 | - HUANG, Y. ET AL., "Selected non-timber forest products with medicinal applications from Jilin Province in China", CONFERENCE TITLE: FOREST COMMUNITIES IN THE THIRD MILLENNIUM: LINKING RESEARCH, BUSINESS, AND POLICY TOWARD A SUSTAINABLE NON-TIMBER FOREST PRODUCT SECTOR; KENORA, ONTARIO, CANADA, 1-4 OCTOBER, 1999; GENERAL TECHNICAL REPORT-NORTH CENTRAL RESEARCH ST, (19991001), pages 93 - 101 | - KANEKO, M. ET AL., "Accelerated recovery from cyclophosphamide-induced leukopenia in mice administered a Japanese ethical herbal drug, Hochu-ekki-to", IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 223 - 231 | - KINJO, J. ET AL., "Anti-herpes virus activity offabaceous triterpenoidal saponins", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (200007), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 887 - 9 | - KHUSHBAKTOVA, Z. A. ET AL., "Influence of cycloartanes from plants of the genus Astragalus and their synthetic analogs on the contractive function of the rnyocarbium and the activity ofNa,K-ATPase", CHEM. NAT. COMPOUNDS, (1994), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 469 - 473 | - LEE, Y.J. ET AL., "Ginsenoside-Rgl, one of the major active molecules from Panax ginseng, is a functional ligand of glucocorticoid receptor", MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL, (199710), vol. 133, no. 2, pages 135 - 40 | - LIU, P. ET AL., "Effect of ginsenosides Rbl, Rg1, Rh1 and Re on proliferation of cells in vitro", TIANRAN CHANWU YANJIU YU KAIFA, (1996), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 36 - 41 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1997:400846 | - ODA, K. ET AL., "Adjuvant and haemolytic activities of 47 saponins derived from medicinal and food plants", BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 381, no. 1, pages 67 - 74 | - PISTELLI, L. ET AL., "Antimicrobial and antifungal activity of crude extracts and isolated saponins from Astragalus verrucosus", FITOTERAPIA, (2002), vol. 73, no. 4, pages 336 - 339 | - WANG, S. ET AL., "Promoting effect of ginsenoside Re on the proliferation of murine bone marrow cells", BAIQZUEN YIKE DAXUE XUEBAO, (1997), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 141 - 142 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1997:570234 | - WANG, Y-P. ET AL., "Effect of astragaloside IV on T,B lymphocyte proliferation and peritoneal macrophage function in mice", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA, (200203), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 263 - 6 | - YASUKAWA, K., "Sterol and triterpene derivatives from plants inhibit the effects of a tumor promoter, and sitosterol and betulinic acid inhibit tumor formation in mouse skin two-stage carcinogenesis", ONCOLOGY, (1991), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 72 - 6 | - YAMAMOTO, M. ET AL., "The stimulatory effects of ginseng saponins on proliferation and DNA synthesis of human vascular endothelial cells and skin fibroblasts in relation to cytokines or growth factors", NISSEI BYOIN IGAKU ZASSHI, (1996), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 12 - 13 | - ZHANG W.J. ET AL., "Regulation of the fibrinolytic potential of cultured human umbilical vein endothelial cells: astragaloside IV downregulates plasminogen activator inhibitor-1 and upregulates tissue-type plasminogen activator expression", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR RESEARCH, (200707), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 273 - 80 | - ZI-PU, L.; QIAN, C., "Effects of astragaloside IV on myocardial calcium transport and cardiac function in ischemic rats", ACTA PHARMACOL SIN, (200210), vol. 23, no. 10, pages 898 - 904 | - KITAGAWA ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1983), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 698 - 708 | - P-H WANG ET AL., J. CHINESE CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 49, pages 103 - 6 | - KITAGAWA ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1983), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 689 - 697 | - OH; SCHNEIDER, J MOL CELL CARDIOL, vol. 34, no. 7, pages 717 - 24 | - MATTSON, EXP GEROTITOL., vol. 35, no. 4, pages 489 - 502 | - SIMONSEN ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 592 - 6 | - THOMAS ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 39 - 42 |