EP2667411 - Sensing device package structure and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unimicron Technology Corp. No. 179, Shanying Rd. Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 333 / TW | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Unimicron Technology Corp. No. 179, Shaning Rd. Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City 333 / TW | ||
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Unimicron Technology Corp. No. 38, Hsing Pong Road Kwei-San Industrial Zone Taoyuan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Tsung-Yuan 2F., No. 182, Zhongpu 2nd St. Taoyuan City 330 Taoyuan County / TW | 02 /
Cheng, Wei-Ming No. 85, Lyushun St. Sanmin District 807 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12180711.9 | 16.08.2012 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | TW20120118729 | 25.05.2012 Original published format: TW 101118729 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667411 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667411 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/0203, H01L21/56, H01L21/60, H01L23/485, // H01L23/31 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
H01L27/14618 (EP);
H01L21/56 (EP);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L24/20 (EP);
H01L27/14636 (EP);
H01L27/14689 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L23/3121 (EP);
H01L23/3135 (EP);
H01L23/315 (EP);
H01L27/14625 (EP);
H01L2924/12042 (EP);
H01L2924/1815 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/48] | H01L27/146, H01L31/0203 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Title | German: | Abtastvorrichtungspaketstruktur und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2013/48] | English: | Sensing device package structure and method of fabricating the same | [2013/48] | French: | Structure de boîtier de dispositif de détection et son procédé de fabrication | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20197731.1 / EP3780075 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2012 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | GB | 16.08.2021 | IE | 16.08.2021 | LU | 16.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.08.2012 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
GB | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.08.2012 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
GB | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
GB | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
GB | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
GB | 16.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4424541 (GOLD STAR ELECTRONICS [KR]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 2a-2f *; | [XAI]US6661084 (PETERSON KENNETH A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 25, line 40 - column 28, line 21 * * column 15, line 11 - line 29 * * figures 4A,15A-15C * [A] 8-13 [I] 5-7; | [XA]EP1494277 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 4A-4D,6 * [A] 8-13; | [A]US2009102002 (CHIA YONG POO [SG], et al) [A] 8-13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 2A-2J *; | [A]WO2009141327 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2011157452 (GOH KIM-YONG [SG], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 3-13 * [A] 8-13 [I] 4-7 | Examination | US2009212382 |