EP2565134 - Storage rack column protector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolog Innovation 622 Rue des Hauts de France 62110 Hénin-Beaumont / FR | [2013/21] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Cuvelier, Damien 1bis, rue Jean Bart Appartement 544 59000 Lille / FR | ||
For all designated states Liers, Christian 2, rue C. Pauwels 62880 Vendin le Vieil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuvelier, Damien 1 bis Rue Jean Bart 59000 Lille / FR | 02 /
Liers, Christian 2 Rue Pauwels 62880 Vendin Le Vieil / FR | [2013/21] |
Former [2013/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 12180777.0 | 17.08.2012 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | FR20110057794 | 02.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1157794 | [2013/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565134 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2565134 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, E01F15/14 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B65G1/02 (EP);
B65G2207/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | Rammschutz für eine Säule eines Lagerregals | [2013/10] | English: | Storage rack column protector | [2013/10] | French: | Structure de protection d'un système de rayonnage | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 16.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2012 | AL | 15.10.2014 | AT | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | ES | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | IT | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2419385 (LAMIGE PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,9 * pages 1-3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE29510388U (ELVEDI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * pages 1-9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2009134289 (GODWIN AARON [US]) [A] 1,9* pages 1-3; figures 1-23 * | by applicant | FR2419385 | US5369925 | US2001047975 | WO2005049453 | WO2005075745 | WO2005103389 |