EP2645522 - A battery storage device for distributed hybrid powered smart grid system and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northeastern University No.11 Third Alley Wenhua Road Heping District Shenyang Liaoning 110819 / CN | [2014/35] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Northeastern University No.11, Lane 3 Wenhua Road Heping District Shenyang, Liaoning 110819 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhang, Huaguang N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | 02 /
Sun, Qiuye N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 03 /
Jiang, Bin N° 29 Yudao Street Baixia District 210016 Nanjing Jiangsu / CN | 04 /
Yang, Jun N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 05 /
Liu, Xinrui N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 06 /
Ma, Dazhong N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 07 /
Liu, Zhenwei N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 08 /
Wang, Zhanshan N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 09 /
He, Zhiqiang N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 10 /
Teng, Fei N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 11 /
Guo, Jing N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 12 /
Li, Xintong N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 13 /
Liang, Junsheng N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 14 /
Li, Yushuai N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | 15 /
Cui, Jin N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang Liaoning / CN | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
Zhang, Huaguang N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | ||
02 /
Sun, Qiuye N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
03 /
Jiang, Bin N° 29 Yudao Street Baixia District 210016 Nanjing / CN | |||
04 /
Yang, Jun N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
05 /
Liu, Xinrui N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
06 /
Ma, Dazhong N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
07 /
Liu, Zhenwei N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
08 /
Wang, Zhanshan N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
09 /
He, Zhiqiang N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
10 /
Teng, Fei N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
11 /
Guo, Jing N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
12 /
Li, Xintong N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
13 /
Liang, Junsheng N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
14 /
Li, Yushuai N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | |||
15 /
Cui, Jin N° 11 Third Alley Wenhua Road, Heping District 110819 Shenyang / CN | Representative(s) | Decamps, Alain René François, et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A. Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [2013/40] | Application number, filing date | 12180853.9 | 17.08.2012 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | CN20121094291 | 31.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210094291 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645522 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2645522 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
H02J7/0024 (EP,US);
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | Batteriespeichersystem für ein verteiltes hybridbetriebenes intelligentes Stromsystem und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2013/40] | English: | A battery storage device for distributed hybrid powered smart grid system and control method thereof | [2013/40] | French: | Système d'accumulateurs pour système de réseau intelligent alimenté hybride et son procédé de commande | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 01.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2012 | AL | 26.11.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | GR | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | RS | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | IE | 17.08.2015 | LU | 17.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/48] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.08.2012 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
GR | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1968167 (O2MICRO INC [US]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]DE102008000560 (DILO TRADING AG [CH]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |