EP2570891 - Projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izukawa, Shintaro c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-Chome Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12181195.4 | 21.08.2012 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | JP20110201736 | 15.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011201736 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570891 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
G03B21/14 (KR);
G06F3/0304 (US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US);
H04N9/3185 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Projektor mit Eingabeobjektdetektierung | [2013/12] | English: | Projector | [2013/12] | French: | Projecteur avec une détection d'un object indicateur | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005270496 (MOCHIZUKI KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * whole document but in particular Figure 13 and corresponding description * [A] 6-15; | [XA]US5525764 (JUNKINS JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * whole document but in particular Figures 1,3,6,12 and corresponding description * [A] 6-15; | [AD]US2009128716 (NAGASHIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [D]JP2009123006 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO); | [X] - YOSHIKI TAKEOKA ET AL, Ztouch: An Infrastructure for 3D gesture interaction in the proximity of tabletop surfaces, PROC. OF ITS 2010: DISPLAYS, SAARBRÜCKEN, GERMANY, PAGE(S) 91 - 94, (20101107), ISBN 978-1-4503-0399-6, XP007921456 [X] 1-15 * whole document but in particular Figure 1-5 with corresponding description * | [A] - JOSHUA STRICKON ET AL, "Tracking Hands Above Large Interactive Surfaces with a Low-Cost Scanning Laser Rangefinder", HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS : MAKING THE IMPOSSIBLE POSSIBLE; 18 - 23 APRIL 1998, LOS ANGELES / CHI 98, READING, MASS. [U.A.] : ADDISON-WESLEY [U.A.], (19980418), ISBN 978-1-58113-028-7, pages 231 - 232, XP007921457 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/286498.286719 | [A] - ANDREW D WILSON ET AL, Combining Multiple Depth Cameras and Projectors for Interactions On, Above, and Between Surfaces, UIST '10 : PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWENTY-THIRD ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, ACM, US, PAGE(S) 273 - 282, (20101003), ISBN 978-1-4503-0271-5, XP007921458 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1866029.1866073 | by applicant | JP2009123006 |